John Laschkewitsch as Administrator for the Estate of Ben Lachkewitsch v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company

Defendant: Lincoln Life and Annuity Distributors, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Laschkewitsch
Case Number: 5:2013cv00315
Filed: April 30, 2013
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: CUMBERLAND
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2015 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 130 Motion TO QUASH NONPARTY PRE-HEARING SUBPOENA. Though Transamerica's subpoena is directed at the defendant in this civil matter, plaintiff's motion to quash is unrelated to this closed civil proceeding which is now on appeal in the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals. For this reason, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to remove the motion to quash and related filings from this docket and to re-file them as a miscellaneous case for adjudication. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/22/2015. Copy of order mailed to plaintiff via US Mail at 1933 Ashridge Drive, Fayetteville, NC 28304. (Marsh, K)
February 5, 2015 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 121 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Stay Judgment. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 2/4/2015. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff, via US Mail, to 1933 Ashridge Drive, Fayetteville, NC, 28304. (Fisher, M.)
September 16, 2014 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 83 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 86 Defendant's Motion to Seal; DENYING 87 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 96 Defendant's Motion to Exclude; GRANTING 100 Plaintiff&# 039;s Motion to Seal Document; DENYING 108 Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude; and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 109 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 9/15/2014. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff via US Mail to the address of record. (Fisher, M.)
June 10, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 72 Plaintiff's Motion Regarding Sufficiency of Answers and Objections, DENYING 74 Plaintiff's Motion to Depose Valerie Lofton, DENYING 76 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, and DENYING AS MOOT 90 Defendant's Motion to Strike. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/9/2014. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff via US Mail. (Fisher, M.)
April 4, 2014 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 65 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Depose Insured's Treating Physicians. Depositions of the following treating physicians are permitted: Dr. Van Tran, Dr. Mani, and Dr. Meltzer. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/3/2014. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff via US Mail. (Fisher, M.)
March 21, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 57 Plaintiff's Motion to Quash, and DENYING 59 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/20/2014. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff via US Mail. (Fisher, M.)
February 24, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 30 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend, GRANTING granting 39 Defendant's Motion to Strike, and GRANTING 42 Defendant's Motion to Strike. Plaintiff's documents filed at 34 and 38 are stricken from the record as having been improperly filed. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 2/24/2014. Copy of order mailed to pro se plaintiff via US Mail. (Fisher, M.)
October 25, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 10 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 21 Defendant's Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/25/2013. The parties are directed to read Order in its entirety for critical information. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff via US Mail. (Fisher, M.)
August 6, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 8 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. Counsel is directed to read Order in its entirety for critical information. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/6/2013. Copy of Order mailed to pro se plaintiff via US Mail. (Fisher, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Laschkewitsch as Administrator for the Estate of Ben Lachkewitsch v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Life and Annuity Distributors, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Nis Leerberg
Represented By: Robert R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Laschkewitsch
Represented By: Coy E. Brewer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?