Wright et al v. State of North Carolina et al

Plaintiff: Calla Wright, Willie J. Bethel, Amy T. Lee, Amygayle L. Womble, John G. Vandenbergh, Barbara Vandenbergh, Ajamu G. Dillahunt, Elaine E. Dillahunt, Lucinda H. Mackethan, William B. Clifford, Ann Long Campbell, Greg Flynn, Beverley S. Clark, Concerned Citizens for African-American Children and Raleigh Wake Citizens Association
Defendant: State of North Carolina and Wake County Board of Elections
Case Number: 5:2013cv00607
Filed: August 22, 2013
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED plaintiffs have failed to prove that either the 2013 Wake County School Board Plan or the 2015 Wake County Commissioners Plan violates the one person one vote requirement in the United States and North C arolina Constitutions. Plaintiffs also have failed to prove that the 2015 General Assembly racially gerrymandered District 4 in the 2015 Wake County Commissioners Plan. Accordingly, the court enters judgment in favor of the defendant Wake County Boar d of Elections. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal entered on June 5, 2015, defendants Chad Barefoot, Philip E. Berger, andTim Moore, are voluntarily dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Nicole Briggeman for Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 2/26/2016. (Briggeman, N.)
December 3, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - the court DENIES the motion to quash [D.E. 41] to the extent it seeks to bar the production of a privilege log and ORDERS the legislative movants file a privilege log by December 11, 2015. Upon receipt, the court will determine whether to gra nt any further relief to the plaintiffs or to the legislative movants. Finally, nothing in this order prevents the legislative movants and the plaintiffs from conferring about their discovery dispute and resolving it without further need for judicial intervention. Cf. Local Civil Rule 7.1 (c). Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 12/3/2015. (Jenkins, C.)
March 17, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 27 Wake County Board of Elections' Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING 29 State of North Carolina's Motion to Dismiss; and DENYING AS FUTILE 33 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend. Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed in their entirety, and the clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close the file. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/14/2014. (Fisher, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright et al v. State of North Carolina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calla Wright
Represented By: Anita S. Earls
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie J. Bethel
Represented By: Anita S. Earls
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy T. Lee
Represented By: Anita S. Earls
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amygayle L. Womble
Represented By: Anita S. Earls
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John G. Vandenbergh
Represented By: Anita S. Earls
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Vandenbergh
Represented By: Anita S. Earls
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ajamu G. Dillahunt
Represented By: Anita S. Earls
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine E. Dillahunt
Represented By: Anita S. Earls
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucinda H. Mackethan
Represented By: Anita S. Earls
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William B. Clifford
Represented By: Anita S. Earls
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Long Campbell
Represented By: Anita S. Earls
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Flynn
Represented By: Anita S. Earls
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverley S. Clark
Represented By: Anita S. Earls
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Concerned Citizens for African-American Children
Represented By: Anita S. Earls
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raleigh Wake Citizens Association
Represented By: Anita S. Earls
Represented By: Allison Jean Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of North Carolina
Represented By: Alexander McClure Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wake County Board of Elections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?