Addison v. Manning

Plaintiff: Edwin R. Addison
Defendant: Katheryn B. Manning
Case Number: 5:2013cv00661
Filed: September 19, 2013
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED the court ENTERS judgment against Edwin R. Addison on his one federal claim, DECLINES to exercise jurisdiction over his remaining state-law claims, and REMANDS the action to New Hanover County Superior Court. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 9/4/2015. (Jenkins, C.)
July 7, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion to Stay. This proceeding is stayed pending the decision on dischargeability by the Bankruptcy Court. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 7/4/2014. (Edwards, S.)
March 6, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Motions to Consolidate. These actions are consolidated with the lead case being Civil Action File No. 5:13-CV-661-D.. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 3/6/2014. (Sawyer, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Addison v. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin R. Addison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katheryn B. Manning
Represented By: James W. Zisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?