Lee, et al v. AK Steel Corp., et al

Plaintiff: Larry Winslowe Lee and Susan Provost Lee
Defendant: AK Steel Corp., Briggs & Stratton Corporation, Certainteed Corporation, Clow Valve Company, Dana Companies LLC, Deere & Company, Eckler's Corvette, Ford Motor Company, Formosa Plastics Corporation U.S.A., Genuine Parts Company, Grinnell LLC, Hajoca Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., Kawasaki Motors Corp., U.S.A., McWane Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Pfizer Inc., Pneumo Abex LLC, Special Electric Company, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation and Yamaha Motor Corporation, U.S.A.
Case Number: 5:2013cv00826
Filed: December 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 340 JUDGMENT - Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 6/27/2016. (Baker, C.)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER granting 338 Joint Motion to Dismiss Defendant J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/23/2016. (Baker, C.)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER granting 334 Joint Motion to Dismiss Pneumo Abex, LLC Without Prejudice - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/12/2016. (Baker, C.)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER granting 314 Motion to Substitute Party - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/9/2016. (Baker, C.)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER granting 321 Motion to Dismiss Genuine Parts Company - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/28/2016. (Baker, C.)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER granting 312 Motion to Dismiss Yamaha Motor Corporation, U.S.A. - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/24/2016. (Baker, C.)
January 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER granting 284 Motion to Dismiss Metropolitan Life Insurance Company - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/14/2016. (Baker, C.)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting 144 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs' Willful and Wanton Conduct Claim (Third Cause) - The parties shall have 60 days to file any motions raising issues pursuant to Federal Rules of Evidence 702, 703, or 705, Daubert v. Merrell Dow Pharm., Inc., 509 U.S. 579 (1993), Kumho Tire Co. v. Carmichael, 526 U.S. 137 (1999) or similar case law. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 7/27/2015. (Tripp, S.)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER granting 212 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Kawasaki Motors Corp., U.S.A. - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/22/2015. (Baker, C.)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER denying 156 Motion for Summary Judgment, styled as a "Notice of Joinder" - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/19/2015. (Baker, C.)
July 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting 148 Motion for Summary Judgment and granting in part and denying in part 151 Motion for Summary Judgment - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/16/2015. (Baker, C.)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting 191 Joint Motion to Dismiss Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 05/11/2015. (Baker, C.)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting 160 Motion to Dismiss Pfizer Inc. - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 03/13/2015. (Baker, C.)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting 136 Joint Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' False Representation/Fraud claim against Genuine Parts Company - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 03/10/2015. (Baker, C.)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER granting 132 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Ford Motor Company - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 02/10/2015. (Baker, C.)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting 114 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and 116 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Dismissal of plaintiffs' false representation/fraud cause ofaction (Fourth Cause) against these two defendants is necessary for failure to state a claim. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 01/26/2015. (Baker, C.)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting 111 Motion to Dismiss Union Carbide Corporation, only, without prejudice - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 08/01/2014. (Baker, C.)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting 109 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Dana Companies LLC - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 05/21/2014. (Baker, C.)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting 84 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and 86 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 04/11/2014. (Baker, C.)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 103 Motion to Dismiss Clow Valve Company and McWane Inc. - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 04/04/2014. (Baker, C.)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 96 Motion to Dismiss Eckler's Corvette Parts - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 03/28/2014. (Baker, C.)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting 95 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Briggs & Stratton Corporation - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 03/26/2014. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee, et al v. AK Steel Corp., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Winslowe Lee
Represented By: Janet Ward Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Provost Lee
Represented By: Janet Ward Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AK Steel Corp.
Represented By: Timothy Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Briggs & Stratton Corporation
Represented By: Timothy Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Represented By: Charles M. Sprinkle, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clow Valve Company
Represented By: Timothy W. Bouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Companies LLC
Represented By: Charles M. Sprinkle, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deere & Company
Represented By: Tracy E. Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eckler's Corvette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Christopher R. Kiger
Represented By: Kirk G. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Formosa Plastics Corporation U.S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Heather Bell Adams
Represented By: Matthew Patrick McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Tracy E. Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hajoca Corporation
Represented By: Tracy E. Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: H. Lee Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kawasaki Motors Corp., U.S.A.
Represented By: Christopher R. Kiger
Represented By: Kirk G. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McWane Inc.
Represented By: Timothy W. Bouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Keith E. Coltrain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer Inc.
Represented By: Tracy E. Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex LLC
Represented By: Timothy W. Bouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Electric Company, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen B. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Charles M. Sprinkle, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yamaha Motor Corporation, U.S.A.
Represented By: Timothy W. Bouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?