Martin v. Bimbo Food Bakeries Distribution, Inc.

Plaintiff: John T. Martin
Defendant: Bimbo Food Bakeries Distribution, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv00017
Filed: January 9, 2014
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: HARNETT
Presiding Judge: W. Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2016 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 107 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 9/21/2016. (Marsh, K)
September 6, 2016 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 105 Motion in Limine. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 9/6/2016. (Marsh, K)
May 2, 2016 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 89 Motion to Strike, denying as moot 91 Motion for Extension of Time, denying 98 Motion to Strike and granting in part and denying in part 102 Motion for Extension of Time. Counsel should read order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 5/2/2016. (Marsh, K)
February 18, 2016 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 71 Motion to Compel and denying 73 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 2/17/2016. Counsel should read order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (Marsh, K)
June 8, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 59 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 6/8/2015. (Marsh, K)
May 20, 2015 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 51 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 5/20/2015. (Marsh, K)
April 23, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 4/23/2015. (Marsh, K)
July 11, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ALLOWING IN PART 14 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's fraud claim is dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's claims for breach of contract and unfair and deceptive trade practices remain. Trial is hereby set for 6/1/2015 in Raleigh, North Carolina. Signed by US Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 7/11/2014. (Fisher, M.)
May 30, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Motion to Strike, granting 30 Motion for Leave to File, denying 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and denying 18 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 5/30/2014. (Marsh, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Bimbo Food Bakeries Distribution, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John T. Martin
Represented By: Edgar R. Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bimbo Food Bakeries Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: Melanie Black Dubis
Represented By: Deborah L. Edney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?