Wilson et al v. Thomas et al
Plaintiff: Logan Wilson, Katherine McCrory, Steven Chambers, Pamela Dickens, Rebecca Kay, Natasha Wright and Disability Rights North Carolina
Defendant: Kelly J. Thomas and Anthony J. Tata
Case Number: 5:2014cv00085
Filed: February 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER deferring in part and granting in part 87 Motion to Compel. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/23/2016. Plaintiff is ORDERED to either respond to this order or respond to defendant's requests and file proof of the same not later than 5:00 PM on August 31, 2016. Failure to do so SHALL result in the defendants' requests for admission being deemed admitted and dismissal of this action with prejudice. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff Natasha Wright via US Mail to 9935 Cherry Creek Boulevard, Apt 206, Raleigh, NC 27617. (Romine, L.)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING 51 Defendants' Motion to Seal the Amended Answer. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 11/24/2014. (Fisher, M.)
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING 34 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Defendants, and all persons acting on their behalf or in concert with them, are hereby ORDERED to cancel any orders requiring plaintiff Natasha Wright to appear for a hear ing regarding her competency to drive and requiring plaintiff Pamela Dickens to obtain and supply any medical certifications of her ability to drive. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiffs shall post a bond with this Court in the amount of $100 as security for potential costs and damages. A hearing on the plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall be held on or before October 29, 2014. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/15/2014. (Fisher, M.)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING 17 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. This matter may proceed in its entirety. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/20/2014. (Fisher, M.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. Thomas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Logan Wilson
Represented By: Lisa Grafstein
Represented By: Holly Anne Stiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine McCrory
Represented By: Lisa Grafstein
Represented By: Holly Anne Stiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Chambers
Represented By: Lisa Grafstein
Represented By: Holly Anne Stiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Dickens
Represented By: Lisa Grafstein
Represented By: Holly Anne Stiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Kay
Represented By: Lisa Grafstein
Represented By: Holly Anne Stiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Wright
Represented By: Lisa Grafstein
Represented By: Holly Anne Stiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Disability Rights North Carolina
Represented By: Lisa Grafstein
Represented By: Holly Anne Stiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly J. Thomas
Represented By: Christopher West Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Tata
Represented By: Christopher West Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?