Impulse Monitoring, Inc. v. Humana Health Plan, Inc.
Plaintiff: Impulse Monitoring, Inc.
Defendant: Humana Health Plan, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv00328
Filed: June 6, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Medicare Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 21 Motion to Stay - It is ORDERED that this action is stayed pending resolution of Defendant's Motion to Transfer pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407 by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/01/2014. (Baker, C.)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 Joint Motion to Stay - All deadlines in this matter, including the deadlines for filing responses to any pending motions and all discovery and pretrial deadlines, are stayed while the parties continue to engage in global settleme nt negotiations. Unless the Court is advised at an earlier date of a related settlement or non-settlement, the parties shall report the status of their negotiations through a joint filing on or before the sixtieth (60th) day following the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 08/21/2014. (Baker, C.)
June 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Stay - All deadlines in this matter, including that requiring the Plaintiff or the Defendant to file any responsive pleadings, are stayed while the parties engage in global settlement negotiations of this and approximat ely sixty-six (66) other similar matters between them. Unless the Court is advised at an earlier date of a related settlement or non-settlement, the parties shall report the status of their negotiations through a joint filing on or before sixty (60) days following the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/22/2014. (Baker, C.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Impulse Monitoring, Inc. v. Humana Health Plan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Impulse Monitoring, Inc.
Represented By: Eric K. Englebardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humana Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Andrew Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?