Laschkewitsch v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: John Laschkewitsch
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2014cv00632
Filed: October 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: CUMBERLAND
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying 53 Motion for Relief from Judgement for Oversight, Omissions, and Want of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction; granting 56 Motion to Seal. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 10/11/2017. Sent to John Laschkewitsch at 1933 Ashridge Drive Fayetteville, NC 28304 via US Mail. (Briggeman, N.)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 47 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 7/17/2017. Sent to John Laschkewitsch at 1933 Ashridge Drive Fayetteville, NC 28304 via US Mail. (Briggeman, N.)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED Laschkewitsch' s motion to dismiss [D.E. 34] is DENIED as baseless. Furthermore, the court DENIES as baseless Laschkewitsch's motion to modify and correct the award [D.E. 42] and motion to vaca te the arbitration award and to dismiss Transamerica's petition [D.E. 43]. Accordingly, pursuant to the June 6, 2016 arbitration award in thematter entitled Transamerica Life Insurance Co. v. Laschkewitsch, American Arbitration Association Case No. 01-14-0000-0878 (Cottle, Arb.), the court hereby FINDS and CONFIRMS that Transamerica Life Insurance Company is entitled to monetary judgment against John Laschkewitsch in the amount of $540,723.76. The court RETAINS jurisdiction for the purpose of enforcing the judgment. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 9/21/2016. (Briggeman, N.)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING 21 Emergency Motion to Dismiss; DENYING 23 Motion for Reconsideration; and DENYING 25 Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 4/20/2015. A certified copy of the order was sent on 4/20/2015 via US Mail to pro se plaintiff John Laschkewitsch, 1933 Ashridge Drive, Fayetteville, NC 28304. (O'Brien, C.)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 4 Motion to Compel Arbitration; DENYING 9 Motion to Remand; and DENYING 13 as MOOT. In sum, the court GRANTS defendant's motion to compel arbitration [D.E. 4] and DISMISSES plaintiff's petition to stay arbitration [D .E. 1-3]. The court DENIES plaintiff's motion to remand [D.E. 9] and DENIES defendant's motion concerning the Rule 26(f) conference [D.E. 13] as moot. The court STAYS the action pending arbitration. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever II I on 1/20/15. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. A certified copy of the Order was sent via US Mail to pro se plaintiff John Laschkewitsch, 1933 Ashridge Drive, Fayetteville, NC 28304. (O'Brien, C.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laschkewitsch v. Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Laschkewitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas M. Jarrell
Represented By: Misty A. Murray
Represented By: Andrew S. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?