The United States of America v. Goodwin
Plaintiff: The United States of America
Defendant: Brentley Goodwin
Case Number: 5:2014cv00906
Filed: December 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DEFAULT JUDGMENT - Judgment is hereby rendered in favor of the plaintiff,United States of America and against defendant Brentley Goodwin for civil penalties assessed pursuant to 26 U.S.C. § 6672 in the sum of $215,617.05, plus statutory in terest accruing after March 6, 2017, to the date of payment for the taxable quarters ending September 30, 2001, December 31,2001, March 31,2002, June 30,2002, September 30,2002, December 31,2002, March 31,2003, June 30,2003, December 31,2003, March 31,2004, and June 30,2004. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 6/20/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Motion for Entry of Default against Brentley Goodwin. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/21/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 8 Motion to Lift the Stay. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 2/13/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER STAYING CASE: Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 362, the action in this court is STAYED pending resolution of the bankruptcy case. Parties shall notify the court within 14 days of settlement or resolution of the bankruptcy case. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever, III on 6/3/2015. (Lee, L.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The United States of America v. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brentley Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United States of America
Represented By: Yonatan Gelblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?