Reaves v. American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Margaret Reaves
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc. and Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Case Number: 5:2015cv00180
Filed: April 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 JUDGMENT in favor of American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC against Margaret Reaves. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/15/2018. (A copy was sent to Margaret Reaves, 604 Sardis Drive, Raleigh, NC 27603). (Collins, S.)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER denying 93 Motion to excuse defendant's corporate representative from in-person attendance at the resumed settlement conference. Motion DENIED. Defendants' corporate representative shall appear at the conference in person as directed. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 1/19/2018. (A copy of this order was sent via US mail to Margaret Reaves, 604 Sardis Drive, Raleigh, NC 27603) (Collins, S.)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying 57 Motion for Summary Judgment and accepting 73 Memorandum and Recommendations - Where claims remain for trial, in accordance with case management order entered September 25, 2015, this case now is ripe for entry of an order governing deadlines and procedures for final pretrial conference and trial. The parties are DIRECTED to confer and file within 14 days from the date of this order a joint status report informing of 1) estimated trial length; 2) par ticular pretrial issues which may require court intervention in advance of trial, if any; and 3) three suggested alternative trial dates. In addition, the parties shall specify if they wish to schedule a court-hosted settlement conference or addition al alternative dispute resolution procedures in advance of trial, and if so the date for completion of such. Finally, the parties shall inform whether any additional discovery may aid resolution of the case. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/29/2017.(Certified copy served via U.S. Mail upon Margaret Reaves, 604 Sardis Drive, Raleigh, NC 27603) (Tripp, S.)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Strike 19 Reply and 20 Exhibits - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 08/18/2015. (Baker, C.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reaves v. American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: D. Kyle Deak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: D. Kyle Deak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?