Ricketts v. Logics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lachantal W. Ricketts
Defendant: Logics, LLC, Logics Solutions, USA Software & Services, LLC and USA Software Operating Co., LLC
Case Number: 5:2015cv00293
Filed: July 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the court GRANTS defendant's motion for summary judgment [D.E. 55]. Defendant may file a motion for costs in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and this court's local rules. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/27/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 52 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. The deadline for filing potentially dispositive motions is extended to February 28, 2017. Except as modified herein, all provisions of the Scheduling Order shall remain in full force and effect. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 1/10/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 49 Motion to Stay Discovery. Within 14 days following the court's ruling on the motion to dismiss the parties shall resume discovery. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 12/28/2016. (Briggeman, N.)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying 44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 12/28/2016. (Briggeman, N.)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 37 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. The deadline for the completion of discovery in this matter is extended to December 15, 2016 and the deadline for filing potentially dispositive motions is extended to January 31, 2017. Except as modified herein, all provisions of the Scheduling Ordershall remain in full force and effect. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 8/19/2016. (Briggeman, N.)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 19 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by August 15, 2016. If plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint by that date, the clerk shall close the case. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 7/27/2016. (Briggeman, N.)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 4 Motion for Reconsideration regarding 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Lachantal W. Ricketts. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 10/13/2015. (Jenkins, C.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricketts v. Logics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lachantal W. Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Logics Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Software & Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Software Operating Co., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?