Norfleet v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Alice Norfleet
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Case Number: 5:2016cv00027
Filed: January 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WILSON
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Commissioner of Social Security pay to Plaintiff's counsel the sum of $6,950.00 and that Plaintiff's counsel pay to Plaintiff the sum of $4,125.00 and upon the payment of such sums this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/28/2018. (Briggeman, N.)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Commissioner of Social Security pay to Plaintiffs attorney $4,125.00 for attorney fees arising under EAJA, 28 U.S.C. §2412(d) if there is no debt that qualifies under the Treasury Offset Program (31 U.S.C. § 3716). If there issuch a debt, any fee remaining after offset will be payable to Plaintiff and delivered to Plaintiffs attorney. It is also ORDERED that the Treasury Judgment Fund pay Plaintiffs attorney $400.00 in costs. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 2/1/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the court adopts the conclusions in the M&R [D.E. 17]. Plaintiff's motion for judgment on the pleadings [D.E. 12] is GRANTED, defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings [D.E. 14] is DENIED, and the action is REMANDED to the Commissioner under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 1/12/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norfleet v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Norfleet
Represented By: Charlotte Williams Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?