JD Solar Solutions, LLC v. Trabant Solar, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: JD Solar Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Trabant Solar, Inc. and Rovshan Sade
Case Number: 5:2016cv00166
Filed: April 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: xxU.S. Outside District
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER - the court DENIES JD Solar's motion for summary judgment concerning its claims and DENIES as moot JD Solar's motion concerning defendants' counterclaims [D.E. 46]. The parties shall engage in a settlement conference with United States Magistrate Judge Gates. The court will set the case for trial by separate order. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 7/9/2019. (Sellers, N.)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 32 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 4/9/2018. (Briggeman, N.)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER LIFTING STAY - The court lifts the stay of this case and orders Trabant Solar, Inc., to have counsel enter an appearance not later than March 3, 2017. If Trabant Solar, Inc. fails to comply with this order, Trabant Solar, Inc. is WARNED that failure to secure counsel might result in the court striking the answer, affirmative defenses, and counterclaim. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 2/3/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JD Solar Solutions, LLC v. Trabant Solar, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JD Solar Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Bettie Kelley Sousa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trabant Solar, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey D. McKinney
Represented By: Robert H. Merritt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rovshan Sade
Represented By: Jeffrey D. McKinney
Represented By: Robert H. Merritt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?