Childress et al v. JPMorgan Chase & Co. et al
Plaintiff: Gary Childress, Anne Childress, Russell Ho, Suzannah Ho and Michael Clifford
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Chase Bank USA, N.A. and Chase Bankcard Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv00298
Filed: May 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 172 Motion to Certify Class; denying 203 Motion to Exclude Evidence; granting 208 Motion to Exclude Evidence; denying 213 Motion to Exclude Damages evidence without prejudice; granting 226 Mo tion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 241 Motion for Leave to File Surreply; denying as moot 243 Motion for Hearing; granting 184 , 186 , 219 , 235 , 245 , 249 Motions to Seal. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 7/2/2019. (Stouch, L.)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting 155 Motion to Stay; denying without prejudice 80 Motion to Compel, 102 Motion to Certify Class, 109 PROPOSED Sealed Motion, 128 PROPOSED Sealed Motion; granting 84 Motion to Seal Document, 86 Motion to Seal Documen t, 117 Motion to Seal Document, 133 Motion to Seal Document. At the close of ninety days from the date of entry of this order, or earlier if mediation is successful or reaches an impasse, the parties shall file a joint notice and status repor t detailing what issues, if any, remain to be adjudicated. On the filing of the joint notice and status report, the clerk shall return the case to the Court's active docket without further order of the Court. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/18/2018. (Stouch, L.)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting 91 Motion to Stay Consideration; granting 95 Motion to Expedite; denying without prejudice 71 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 100 Motion for conference; granting in part 119 Motion for Extension of Time to F ile Response: Response to 102 Motion to Certify Class due 2/16/2018; granting in part 78 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 2/5/2018. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for important deadlines and information. (Stouch, L.)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and denying without prejudice 44 Motion to Compel. Fact discovery shall close in this case on February 11, 2018; expert discovery on liability shall close on March 25, 2018; and any dispositive motions shall be filed not later than July 24, 2018. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/29/2017. (Stouch, L.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Childress et al v. JPMorgan Chase & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Childress
Represented By: Christopher S. Battles
Represented By: Brandon S. Neuman
Represented By: Kieran J. Shanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Childress
Represented By: Christopher S. Battles
Represented By: Brandon S. Neuman
Represented By: Kieran J. Shanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Ho
Represented By: Christopher S. Battles
Represented By: Brandon S. Neuman
Represented By: Kieran J. Shanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzannah Ho
Represented By: Christopher S. Battles
Represented By: Brandon S. Neuman
Represented By: Kieran J. Shanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Clifford
Represented By: Christopher S. Battles
Represented By: Brandon S. Neuman
Represented By: Kieran J. Shanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bankcard Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?