Morgan v. Spivey, et al
Plaintiff: Michael J. Morgan
Defendant: Ricky Jason Spivey, Casey Lane Miller, Joshua Kyle Legan, Donnie Harrison and Wake County, North Carolina
Case Number: 5:2016cv00365
Filed: June 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER finding as moot 184 Motion to Intervene; granting 190 Motion for Reconsideration regarding 177 Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion to Bifurcate. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/17/2019. (Collins, S.)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER denying 143 Motion in Limine to Bar Plaintiff's Use of Alternative Tactics Evidence/Argument; denying 149 Motion in Limine; granting Oral Motion in alternative to Bifurcate issue of punitive damages. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/5/2019. (Collins, S.)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 110 Motion for Summary Judgment. The parties are DIRECTED to confer and file within 21 days from date of entry of this order a joint status report specifying the estimated length o f the trial, three alternative suggested trial dates, and suggested alternative dispute resolution techniques to be employed prior to trial in attempt to resolve the issues between the parties. Upon receipt of the parties' report, unless advance conference with the court is requested therein, the court will enter such further order as is warranted regarding pretrial and trial scheduling. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/2/2019. (Collins, S.)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER - Defendants' joint motion to compel [DE99] is DENIED and plaintiff's motion for protective order [DE105] is GRANTED. Defendants request for attorney's fees is DENIED. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/8/2017. (Collins, S.)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Dismiss and granting in part and denying in part 76 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/29/2017. (Tripp, S.)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying as moot 48 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Partial Judgment on the Pleadings and granting 51 First Motion to Amend 1 Complaint - Plaintiff shall file and served its amended complaint within 14 days. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/14/2016. (Tripp, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. Spivey, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Morgan
Represented By: Matthew David Ballew
Represented By: Ryan D. Oxendine
Represented By: Robert E. Zaytoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Jason Spivey
Represented By: J. Nicholas Ellis
Represented By: Paul Gerard Gessner
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Lane Miller
Represented By: J. Nicholas Ellis
Represented By: Paul Gerard Gessner
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Kyle Legan
Represented By: J. Nicholas Ellis
Represented By: Paul Gerard Gessner
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnie Harrison
Represented By: J. Nicholas Ellis
Represented By: Paul Gerard Gessner
Represented By: Caroline P. Mackie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wake County, North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?