Gore V. 3M Company, et al.

Plaintiff: Faye Gore
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, A.W. Chesterton Company, Crane Co., E.I. Dupont De Nemours & Company, Flowserve Corporation, Ingersoll-Rand Company, The William Powell Company, Armstrong International, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., John Crane, Inc. and Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2016cv00716
Filed: August 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: xxU.S. Outside District
Presiding Judge: James C. Fox
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER granting 340 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 1/7/2019. (Herrmann, L.)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER denying 205 Motion in Limine; denying 206 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 211 Motion in Limine; denying 216 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 229 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 236 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 248 Motion in Limine. The Clerk is directed to schedule a final pretrial conference no earlier than 45 days from the filing of this order. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 9/21/2018. (Herrmann, L.)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER granting 305 Motion to Dismiss as to defendant Crane Co. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 12/15/2017. (Edwards, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gore V. 3M Company, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faye Gore
Represented By: Janet Ward Black
Represented By: Kevin W. Paul
Represented By: Jeffrey B. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Travis Andrew Bustamante
Represented By: William Michael Starr
Represented By: Tracy E. Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Represented By: Elizabeth D. Scott
Represented By: Mark S. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Ronald A. Charlot
Represented By: RICHARD A. FARRIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Dupont De Nemours & Company
Represented By: Daniel Gray Clodfelter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Represented By: James M. Dedman, IV
Represented By: Daniel B. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Timothy Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The William Powell Company
Represented By: David B. Oakley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Travis Andrew Bustamante
Represented By: William Michael Starr
Represented By: Tracy E. Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Travis Andrew Bustamante
Represented By: William Michael Starr
Represented By: Tracy E. Tomlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen B. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Keith E. Coltrain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?