Cole v. Wake County Board of Education
Plaintiff: Wanza Cole
Defendant: Wake County Board of Education
Case Number: 5:2016cv00765
Filed: August 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that on October 22, 2018, the Plaintiff voluntarily dismissed all ADA and IIED claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, AND DECREED that the court GRANTS the defendant's motion for summary judgment [D.E. 66]. Defendant may file a motion for costs in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and this court's local rules. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/2/2020. (Sellers, N.)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 51 Motion to Stay Discovery. All discovery in this civil action, including all deadlines and requirements for conference activities and any and all discovery requirements shall be STAYED pending resolution of Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal by the Court. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 10/2/2018. (Sellers, N.)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 37 Motion to Stay Discovery. All discovery in this civil action, including all deadlines and requirements for conference activities and any and all discovery requirements in the current Scheduling Order be STAYED until the Parties n otify the Court that Plaintiff's currently pending Charge of Discrimination has been resolved by the Equal Employment Opportunity Commission("EEOC"). The Parties shall notify the Court within ten (10) days of receiving notice from the EEOC that Plaintiff's Charge of Discrimination has been resolved, including but not limited to issuance of a Dismissal and Notice of Rights letter by the EEOC. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from receipt of notice from the EEOC regarding resolution of Plaintiff's Charge of Discrimination to seek leave of court to file a second amended complaint. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 10/30/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATED CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 7/3/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 21 Motion to Dismiss; denying 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 4/10/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying 11 Motion to Dismiss; denying 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 15 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The amended complaint is due no later than January 9, 2017. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 12/28/2016. (Briggeman, N.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Wake County Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanza Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wake County Board of Education
Represented By: Adam S. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?