Diede v. UNC Healthcare et al
Plaintiff: Annmarie Diede
Defendant: UNC Healthcare, Beth Paganini-Finch, Bradley Jensen, Christina Vanessa Daniels, Raja Hussari and Jerry Unknown
Case Number: 5:2016cv00788
Filed: September 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: xxU.S. Outside District
Presiding Judge: W. Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 JUDGMENT in favor of UNC Healthcare, and Raja Hussari against Annmarie Diede. Signed by Susan Edwards, Deputy for Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/17/2018. (Edwards, S.)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; 12 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; 12 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail to plaintiff a blank summons form to complete and return to the Clerk within 20 days. Upon receipt of the completed form, the Clerk is DIRECTED to issue the summons plaintiff provided for UNC Healthcare. The U.S. Marshal is DIRECTED to serve the summons and complaint on UNC Healthcare. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 1/24/2018. Copy sent to Annmarie Diede 130 S Estes Dr, Chapel Hill, NC 27514 via US Mail with a blank proposed summons form. (Edwards, S.)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 12 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 12 UNC Healthcare's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs claims against Hussari remain. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 1/23/2018. Copy sent to Annmarie Diede 130 S Estes Dr, Chapel Hill, NC 27514 via US Mail. (Edwards, S.)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER adopting 3 Memorandum and Recommendations. Plaintiff's battery claim is DISMISSED, and defendants Beth Paganini-Finch, Bradley Jensen, Christina Vanessa Daniels, and Jerry Unknown are DISMISSED from the action. Plaintiff's Tit le VII claims for hostile work environment and retaliation and assault claim against defendants UNC Healthcare and Hussari remain. The Clerk is DIRECTED to issue the summonses plaintiff provided for UNC Healthcare and Hussari. The U.S. Marshal is DIRECTED to serve the summonses and complaint on defendants. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 2/23/2017. Order to plaintiff via US Mail at 130 So Estes Dr., Camelot Village A10, Chapel Hill, NC 27514. (Marsh, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diede v. UNC Healthcare et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annmarie Diede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNC Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Paganini-Finch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Vanessa Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raja Hussari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?