Nagelberg v. Defense Finance & Accounting Service et al

Plaintiff: Joshua L. Nagelberg
Defendant: Defense Finance & Accounting Service, Equifax Information Services, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv00824
Filed: September 29, 2016
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 10/17/2017. (Stouch, L.)
October 13, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Motion for Referral to Court-Hosted Settlement Conference with United States Magistrate Judge. The above-captioned action is hereby REFERRED to US Magistrate Judge Jones for a court-hosted settlement conference, to be conducted at the direction of Judge Jones. Signed by United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/13/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
September 11, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 39 Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 9/11/2017. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (Briggeman, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nagelberg v. Defense Finance & Accounting Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua L. Nagelberg
Represented By: Matthew W. Buckmiller
Represented By: Joseph Z. Frost
Represented By: Trawick H. Stubbs, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defense Finance & Accounting Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Chelsea J. Corey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Caren D. Enloe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?