July 22, 2022 |
Filing
234
ORDER granting 205 Motion for Attorney Fees. The court AWARDS attorneys' fees in the amount of $1,052,569.70 to plaintiffs from defendants jointly and severally. Plaintiffs may seek additional attorneys' fees after the court enters a final judgment. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 7/22/2022. Sent to Jeffrey Van Valkenburgh at 5904 A Warner Ave. #170 Huntington Beach, CA 92649 and Michael D Long 3948 Legacy Drive Suite 106-155 Plano, TX 75023 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
|
July 21, 2022 |
Filing
233
ORDER denying 214 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 7/21/2022. Sent to Jeffrey Van Valkenburgh at 5904 A Warner Ave. #170 Huntington Beach, CA 92649 and Michael D Long 3948 Legacy Drive Suite 106-155Plano, TX 75023 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
|
August 16, 2021 |
Filing
188
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Progress Solar Solutions, LLC against Fire Protection, Inc. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 8/16/2021. (Sellers, N.)
|
August 12, 2021 |
Filing
186
ORDER granting 169 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 8/12/2021. Sent to Jeffrey Van Valkenburgh at 5904 A Warner Ave. #170 Huntington Beach, CA 92649, Michael D Long and Solar Mod Systems, Inc. at 3948 Legacy Drive Suite 106-155 Plano, TX 75023, and Mikel Bills at 11737 Belmont Place Chino, CA 91710 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
|
August 11, 2021 |
Filing
185
ORDER granting 174 - The Court hereby STRIKES the Answer of Defendant FireProtection, Inc. dba Fire Protection Environmental, and enters default against Fire Protection, Inc. dba Fire Protection Environmental for its ongoing non-compliance with this Court's orders. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed default judgment concerning Defendant Fire Protection, Inc. not later than one week from today's date. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 8/11/2021. (Sellers, N.)
|
March 22, 2021 |
Filing
182
ORDER granting 181 Motion to Consolidate Reply Filings and Deadlines. Plaintiffs shall file on or before March 29, 2021, a single consolidated brief of no greater than 15 pages in reply to all Defendants' responses filed thus far (D.E. 176, 178, 180 and D.E. 76, 78, 80). Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 3/22/2021. Sent to Mikel Bills at 11737 Belmont Place Chino, CA 91710, Michael D Long at 3948 Legacy Drive Suite 106-155 Plano, TX 75023, and Jeffrey Van Valkenburgh at 5904 A Warner Ave. #170 Huntington Beach, CA 92649 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
|
January 6, 2021 |
Filing
166
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Progress Solar Solutions, LLC against Solar Mod Systems, Inc. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 1/6/2021. Sent to Michael D Long and Solar Mod Systems, Inc. at 3948 Legacy Drive Suite 106-155 Plano, TX 75023 and Mikel Bills at 11737 Belmont Place Chino, CA 91710 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
|
December 29, 2020 |
Filing
163
ORDER denying 149 Motion for Reconsideration; granting 152 Motion for Sanctions; granting 154 Motion to Compel. The court hereby STRIKES the answer of defendant Solar Mod Systems, Inc., and enters default against Solar Mod Systems, Inc. for its ongoing non-compliance with this court's orders. Plaintiffs shall submit a proposed default judgment concerning Solar Mod Systems, Inc. not later than January 5, 2021. The court SANCTIONS Bills in the amount of plaintiffs' reasonable at torney's fees incurred in connection with the motions and related briefing. Plaintiffs shall submit a schedule detailing itsreasonable attorney's fees not later than January 5, 2021. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 12/29/2020. Sent to Michael D Long at 3948 Legacy Drive Suite 106-155 Plano, TX 75023 and Mikel Bills at 11737 Belmont Place Chino, CA 91710 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
|
September 24, 2020 |
Filing
148
ORDER - In sum, the court GRANTS PSS's motions to consolidate [D.E. 123], [D.E. 25]. GRANTS PSS's motion for summary judgment concerning FPl's counterclaims [D.E. 129], GRANTS PSS's motion for summary judgment concerning SMS 9;s counterclaims [D.E. 131], DENIES PSS's motion for an entry of default, default judgment, and to strike SMS's answer [D.E.140], [D.E. 34]. WARNS SMS that it must cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance on or before October 16, 2020, DENIES Bills's motions to dismiss [D.E. 142], [D.E. 36], DENIES Long's motion to dismiss [D.E. 37], DENIES PSS's motion for sanctions [D.E. 144], WARNS Bills that failure to comply with this court's orders will result in th e court entering default judgment against him, ORDERS Bills to pay PSS's costs associated with its motion for sanctions, and GRANTS PSS's motion to extend the scheduling order deadlines [D.E. 44]. The deadline for filing dispositive moti ons is November 16, 2020. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever, III on 9/24/2020. Copy sent via US Mail to Mikel Bills at 11737 Belmont Place, Chino, CA 91710; Michael D Long and Solar Mod Systems at 3948 Legacy Drive, Suite 106-155, Plano, TX 75023; and Jeffrey Van Valkenburgh at5904 A Warner Ave., #170, Huntington Beach, CA 92649. (Stouch, L.)
|
May 20, 2020 |
Filing
147
ORDER granting 145 Motion to File 15-Page Brief. Sent to Mikel Bills at 11737 Belmont Place Chino, CA 91710 and Michael D Long at 3948 Legacy Drive Suite 106-155 Plano, TX 75023 via US Mail. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 5/20/2020. (Sellers, N.)
|
September 17, 2019 |
Filing
126
ORDER allowing in part and denying in part 99 Motion to Compel; allowing in part and denying in part 114 Motion to Compel. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 9/17/2019. (Sellers, N.)
|
August 1, 2019 |
Filing
122
ORDER granting 103 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and dismissing SMS's defamation counterclaim. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 8/1/2019. (Sellers, N.)
|
February 25, 2019 |
Filing
117
ORDER - Progress Solar's motion to compel (D.E. 72 ) is ALLOWED to the extent of the relief provided for herein. The motion is otherwise DENIED without prejudiceto Progress Solar's seeking relief with respect any supplemental production by defendants. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 2/25/2019. (Sellers, N.)
|
September 24, 2018 |
Filing
98
PROTECTIVE ORDER AND CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT (As Modified) - Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 9/24/2018. (Sellers, N.)
|
December 18, 2017 |
Filing
51
ORDER denying 32 Motion to Strike ; denying 7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 17 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 12/18/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
|
September 14, 2017 |
Filing
40
ORDER granting 37 Motion to Substitute Party. John Doe and Jeffrey Van Valkenburgh added. Norman Stephen Van Valkenburgh terminated; granting 37 Motion to Amend the Case Caption. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 9/14/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
|