Acosta v. Aimet Technologies, LLC
Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Defendant: Aimet Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 5:2017cv00442
Filed: August 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of R. Alexander Acosta against Aimet Technologies, LLC. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/15/2018. (Collins, S.)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Entry of Default Request for Entry of Default - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/2/2018. (Tripp, S.)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. This preliminary injunction is to continue until further order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/27/2017. (Collins, S.)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - A copy of this Order, together with a copy of Plaintiffs Motion, and all other filings of record not heretofore served, be served upon the Defendant forthwith by a representative of the Wage and H our Division, United States Department of Labor. The court holds in abeyance remaining part of plaintiffs motion, and where it is well-established that a corporation cannot proceed pro se, accords defendant, served September 14, 2017, opportunity now to obtain counsel, prior to setting of any Rule 16 status conference, to address in part a schedule for resolution of issues presented. Where this Order shall expire at 11:00 a.m., on the 25th day of October, 2017, should plaintiff seek to show good cause for extension of same prior to expiration of the order, request for continuance may be filed. It shall show the position of defendant on its face. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/11/2017. (Collins, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Aimet Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Represented By: Kristin R. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aimet Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?