United States of America v. Leak et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Melanie Boyd Leak, Mia Danielle Leak and Cedar Hill Homeowners Association, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2017cv00454
Filed: September 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 JUDGMENT - In accordance with the court's order entered February 17, 2021, and for the reasons set forth more specifically therein, that defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted. The United States has valid federal tax liens against the real property known as 541 Pine Ridge Place, Raleigh, North Carolina 27609. The federal tax liens are foreclosed. The property shall be sold with the proceeds to be distributed to the United States to be applied against the amounts owed for the tax years at issue, all in accordance with the terms of this order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/17/2021. (Collins, S.)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 31 Motion for Entry of Default of Mia Danielle Leak - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/7/2018.(Certified copy served via U.S. Mail upon Melanie Boyd Leak, 7065 Hill Gail Dr., New Albany, OH 43054; Cedar Hill Homeowners Association, Inc., c/o Kohn-Ell Association Management Services, LLC, Registered Agent, 205 West Millbrook Road, Suite 210, Raleigh, NC 27609; and, Mia Danielle Leak, 541 Pine Ridge Place, Raleigh, NC 27609) (Tripp, S.)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying 25 Motion for Entry of Default without prejudice. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/13/2018. (Collins, S.)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 8 Motion for Entry of Default against Melanie Boyd Leak. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/20/2018. (Collins, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Leak et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Boyd Leak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mia Danielle Leak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedar Hill Homeowners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Ryan O. McMonagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?