Epic Games, Inc. et al v. Broom
Plaintiff: Epic Games, Inc. and Epic Games International S. r.l.
Defendant: Brandon Broom
Case Number: 5:2017cv00511
Filed: October 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: BEAUFORT
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 40 Motion to Seal Document 39 Affidavit of Service - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/13/2018. (Tripp, S.)
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 12 Motion for Entry of Default - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/20/2018. (Tripp, S.)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/9/2018. (Collins, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epic Games, Inc. et al v. Broom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epic Games, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epic Games International S. r.l.
Represented By: Christopher M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Broom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?