The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Mora et al

Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Jesus Guillermo Mora, Andrea Nunez and Kaiya Jewliet Proctor
Case Number: 5:2018cv00007
Filed: January 11, 2018
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: CUMBERLAND
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2018 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/17/2018. (Collins, S.)
June 29, 2018 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Amended Motion for Entry of Default Against Jesus Guillermo Mora. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/29/2018. (Collins, S.)
May 15, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion for Entry of Default without prejudice to renew within 21 days. Any renewed request must explain why leaving a copy of the summons and complaint with "CCDE Attorney Booth" is sufficient to show service of process on defendant Mora under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(e). Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/15/2018. (Collins, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Mora et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Benjamin L. Worley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Guillermo Mora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiya Jewliet Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?