Nallapaty et al v. Nallapati et al

Plaintiff: Hari Hara Prasad Nallapaty and Justh Holdings LLC
Defendant: Russell Lawrence, Russell S. Lawrence CPA PC and Vamsi Mohan Nallapati
Case Number: 5:2018cv00098
Filed: March 12, 2018
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: xxOutside U.S.
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2018 26 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Discovery by Justh Holdings LLC, Hari Hara Prasad Nallapaty (Yost, Joshua)
October 2, 2018 25 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Discovery by Russell Lawrence, Russell S. Lawrence CPA PC (Sharpless, Frederick)
September 28, 2018 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Nallapati's Consent Motion for Extension of Time #24 . It is ordered that Defendant Nallapati shall have up to and including October 31, 2018, within which to respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents. Counsel are reminded that pursuant to Rule 29 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, stipulations of extension of time for responses to discovery under Rules 33, 34, and 36 do not need approval from the court provided the extension does not interfere with any time set for completion of discovery, for a hearing of a motion, or for trial. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/28/2018. (Hockaday, A.)
September 28, 2018 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time. (Sellers, N.)
September 28, 2018 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Vamsi Mohan Nallapati. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order) (Parry, Kirk)
August 23, 2018 23 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/24/2019. Motions due by 6/21/2019. The matter will be set for trial by separate order. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 8/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Form) (Sellers, N.)
July 10, 2018 22 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Justh Holdings LLC, Hari Hara Prasad Nallapaty. (Coble, Charles)
June 4, 2018 21 Featured Case ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/4/2018. (Briggeman, N.)
June 4, 2018 20 ANSWER to #18 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, by Justh Holdings LLC, Hari Hara Prasad Nallapaty. (Coble, Charles)
May 18, 2018 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Russell Lawrence, Russell S. Lawrence CPA PC. (Sharpless, Frederick)
May 14, 2018 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Hari Hara Prasad Nallapaty by Vamsi Mohan Nallapati. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Corporate resolutions, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter to Prasad's Attorneys, #3 Exhibit 3 - Justh Resolution, #4 Exhibit 4 - Order from WA Court, #5 Exhibit 5 - Holdings Resolution, #6 Exhibit 6 - Group Resolution, #7 Exhibit 7 - Holdings Resolution, #8 Exhibit 8 - Group Resolution) (White, James)
May 4, 2018 17 Financial Disclosure Statement by Russell Lawrence (Sharpless, Frederick)
May 4, 2018 16 Financial Disclosure Statement by Russell S. Lawrence CPA PC (Sharpless, Frederick)
March 26, 2018 15 Financial Disclosure Statement by Vamsi Mohan Nallapati (White, James)
March 26, 2018 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Frederick K. Sharpless on behalf of Russell Lawrence, Russell S. Lawrence CPA PC. (Sharpless, Frederick)
March 26, 2018 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Russell Lawrence, Russell S. Lawrence CPA PC. Russell Lawrence waiver sent on 3/20/2018, answer due 5/19/2018; Russell S. Lawrence CPA PC waiver sent on 3/20/2018, answer due 5/19/2018. (Sharpless, Frederick)
March 26, 2018 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Kirk Alan Parry, Jr on behalf of Vamsi Mohan Nallapati. (Parry, Kirk)
March 23, 2018 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Michelle Merck Walker on behalf of Vamsi Mohan Nallapati. (Walker, Michelle)
March 23, 2018 10 Notice of Appearance filed by James C. White on behalf of Vamsi Mohan Nallapati. (White, James)
March 13, 2018 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Jessica Thaller-Moran on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Thaller-Moran, Jessica)
March 13, 2018 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Brian C. Fork on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Fork, Brian)
March 13, 2018 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Joshua Aaron Yost on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Yost, Joshua)
March 13, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to Russell Lawrence, Vamsi Mohan Nallapati, Russell S. Lawrence CPA PC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
March 12, 2018 5 Notice filed by Justh Holdings LLC, Hari Hara Prasad Nallapaty regarding #1 Complaint Proposed Summonses. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons) (Coble, Charles)
March 12, 2018 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Justh Holdings LLC (Coble, Charles)
March 12, 2018 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Hari Hara Prasad Nallapaty (Coble, Charles)
March 12, 2018 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Charles E. Coble on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Coble, Charles)
March 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4430297.), filed by Hari Hara Prasad Nallapaty, Justh Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Organizational chart, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Coble, Charles) Modified on 3/13/2018 to describe exhibit. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nallapaty et al v. Nallapati et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hari Hara Prasad Nallapaty
Represented By: Charles E. Coble
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Yost
Represented By: Brian C. Fork
Represented By: Jessica Thaller-Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justh Holdings LLC
Represented By: Charles E. Coble
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Yost
Represented By: Brian C. Fork
Represented By: Jessica Thaller-Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Lawrence
Represented By: Frederick K. Sharpless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell S. Lawrence CPA PC
Represented By: Frederick K. Sharpless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vamsi Mohan Nallapati
Represented By: Michelle Merck Walker
Represented By: Kirk Alan Parry, Jr.
Represented By: James C. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?