DeKalb Farmers Market, Inc. v. Collazo Produce, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: DeKalb Farmers Market, Inc.
Defendant: Collazo Produce, Inc., Juan Castillo and Oscar N. Collazo
Case Number: 5:2018cv00201
Filed: May 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: BEAUFORT
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 55 Motion to Dismiss. Any and all of Pioneer GrowersCooperative's claims against United Produce LLC shall be and are hereby dismissed, with the parties bearing their own costs. All claims made by Plaintiff Wood's Produce Co., Inc. remain pending for adjudication by this Court. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 8/1/2019. (Sellers, N.)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Juan Antonio Pacheco. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/28/2019. (Sellers, N.)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 24 Motion for Entry of Default. Default is hereby entered against Defendants Juan Antonio Pacheco a/k/a Juan Antonio Castillo and United Produce, LLC Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 12/17/2018. (Sellers, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeKalb Farmers Market, Inc. v. Collazo Produce, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeKalb Farmers Market, Inc.
Represented By: Leslie Lane Mize
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collazo Produce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar N. Collazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?