Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 3.534 Acres, +/-, in Johnston Cty, NC, PIN 09-H-15-054, Described as Property of Frances C. Lee in DB 4360, P 850, Instr. No. 2013399204, Last Will/Testament of Frances Carroll Lee found as 13-E-009 et al
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Defendant: 3.534 Acres, +/-, in Johnston Cty, NC, PIN 09-H-15-054, Described as Property of Frances C. Lee in DB 4360, P 850, Instr. No. 2013399204, Last Will/Testament of Frances Carroll Lee found as 13-E-009 and John Max Lee, Jr.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00365
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: JOHNSTON
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by 3.534 Acres, /-, in Johnston Cty, NC, PIN 09-H-15-054, Described as Property of Frances C. Lee in DB 4360, P 850, Instr. No. 2013399204, Last Will/Testament of Frances Carroll Lee found as 13-E-009, John Max Lee, Jr. (Lollar, Charles)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 Notice filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC regarding proof of service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acceptance of Service for John Max Lee, Jr. and the real property owned thereby described in the Complaint) (Kitchin, Henry)
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Dhamian A. Blue on behalf of Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Blue, Dhamian)
July 23, 2018 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle for all further proceedings. Chief United States District Judge James C. Dever III is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 5:18-CV-365-BO. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/23/2018. (Hockaday, A.)
July 23, 2018 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Henry L. Kitchin, Jr on behalf of Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dominion Energy, Inc., Corporate Parent Duke Energy Corp., Corporate Parent Southern Company for Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4589109.), filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 Depiction of Property, #3 Exhibit 2 FERC Certificate, #4 Exhibit 3 Map Depicting Route of ACP Project, #5 Exhibit 4 Plat of Easements, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Notice of Filing of Complaint in Condemnation, #8 Notice Regarding Use of Notice of Filing In Lieu of Summons) (Kitchin, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 3.534 Acres, +/-, in Johnston Cty, NC, PIN 09-H-15-054, Described as Property of Frances C. Lee in DB 4360, P 850, Instr. No. 2013399204, Last Will/Testament of Frances Carroll Lee found as 13-E-009 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: Henry L. Kitchin, Jr.
Represented By: Dhamian A. Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.534 Acres, +/-, in Johnston Cty, NC, PIN 09-H-15-054, Described as Property of Frances C. Lee in DB 4360, P 850, Instr. No. 2013399204, Last Will/Testament of Frances Carroll Lee found as 13-E-009
Represented By: Charles M. Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Max Lee, Jr.
Represented By: Charles M. Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?