Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 1.713 Acres, More or Less, in Wilson County, North Carolina, Located on Parcel Identification No. 2760-36-6807.000, and Identified as Being a Portion of 119.8 Acre(s) Described in Book 2057, Page 80, et al
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Defendant: Wade Raymond Finch, Heather Louise Finch, Pearl Lamm Finch and 1.713 Acres, More or Less, in Wilson County, North Carolina, Located on Parcel Identification No. 2760-36-6807.000, and Identified as Being a Portion of 119.8 Acre(s) Described in Book 2057, Page 80,
Case Number: 5:2018cv00388
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WILSON
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by 1.713 Acres, More or Less, in Wilson County, North Carolina, Located on Parcel Identification No. 2760-36-6807.000, and Identified as Being a Portion of 119.8 Acre(s) Described in Book 2057, Page 80,, Heather Louise Finch, Pearl Lamm Finch, Wade Raymond Finch. (Lollar, Charles)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 Notice filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC regarding proof of service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acceptance of Service for Pearl Lamm Finch, Wade Raymond Finch, Heather Louise Finch, and the real property owned thereby described in the Complaint) (Kitchin, Henry)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Dhamian A. Blue on behalf of Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Blue, Dhamian)
August 6, 2018 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Henry L. Kitchin, Jr on behalf of Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dominion Energy, Inc., Corporate Parent Duke Energy Corp., Corporate Parent Southern Company for Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4606727.), filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 - Depiction of Finch Property, #3 Exhibit 2 - FERC Certificate, #4 Exhibit 3 - Map Depicting Route of ACP Project, #5 Exhibit 4 - Plat of Finch Easements, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Notice of Filing of Complaint in Condemnation, #8 Notice Regarding Use of Notice of Filing) (Kitchin, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 1.713 Acres, More or Less, in Wilson County, North Carolina, Located on Parcel Identification No. 2760-36-6807.000, and Identified as Being a Portion of 119.8 Acre(s) Described in Book 2057, Page 80, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: Henry L. Kitchin, Jr.
Represented By: Dhamian A. Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade Raymond Finch
Represented By: Charles M. Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Louise Finch
Represented By: Charles M. Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pearl Lamm Finch
Represented By: Charles M. Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.713 Acres, More or Less, in Wilson County, North Carolina, Located on Parcel Identification No. 2760-36-6807.000, and Identified as Being a Portion of 119.8 Acre(s) Described in Book 2057, Page 80,
Represented By: Charles M. Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?