N.C. v. Jimmerson et al
Plaintiff: N.C. and Celeste Vicente
Defendant: Eric Tyrek Jimmerson and Apex Coach LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv00409
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - Pursuant to Local ADR Rule 101.1c(a), counsel is reminded that the parties must file a written statement identifying an agreed upon mediator within twenty one (21) days of the entry of the Scheduling Order. If a statement is not timely filed, the Clerk of Court will appoint a mediator from the list of court certified mediators. Selection of Mediator must be electronically filed on or before 10/30/2018. (Collins, S.)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery in this case may be governed by a protective order. Discovery due by 11/1/19. Mediation Deadline set for 11/1/19. Motions due by 12/2/19. The parties should review the attached order in its entirety for additional critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/9/18. (Collins, S.)
October 3, 2018 Filing 20 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Apex Coach LLC, Eric Tyrek Jimmerson. (Griffin, Robert)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 10/22/2018. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/17/2018. (Tripp, S.)
September 11, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by Apex Coach LLC, Eric Tyrek Jimmerson. (Griffin, Robert)
August 31, 2018 Filing 17 Certificate of Service filed by N.C., Celeste Vicente regarding #16 Financial Disclosure Statement . (Truzy, Karonnie)
August 31, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #16 Financial Disclosure Statement. Fed.R.Civ.P. 5(d)(1) requires a certificate of service. Counsel is directed to file a captioned document titled "Certificate of Service" using the Certificate of Service event located under the Service of Process category, and linking the appropriate document when prompted. (Collins, S.)
August 30, 2018 Filing 16 Financial Disclosure Statement by N.C., Celeste Vicente (Truzy, Karonnie)
August 30, 2018 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Karonnie R. Truzy on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Truzy, Karonnie)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #8 Notice of Removal. Apex Coach LLC answer and Eric Tyrek Jimmerson answer due 9/19/2018. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/27/2018. (Collins, S.)
August 27, 2018 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #8 Notice of Removal. (Collins, S.)
August 24, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #8 Notice of Removal, filed by Apex Coach LLC, Eric Tyrek Jimmerson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time to Answer Complaint) (Thornton, James)
August 22, 2018 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert Hugh Griffin on behalf of Apex Coach LLC, Eric Tyrek Jimmerson. (Griffin, Robert)
August 22, 2018 Filing 11 Financial Disclosure Statement by Apex Coach LLC (Thornton, James)
August 22, 2018 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by Eric Tyrek Jimmerson (Thornton, James)
August 22, 2018 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by James C. Thornton on behalf of Apex Coach LLC, Eric Tyrek Jimmerson. (Thornton, James)
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Apex Coach LLC, Eric Tyrek Jimmerson from Superior Court, Johnston County, case number 18 CVS 2122. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 26BOMBJ9), filed by Apex Coach LLC, Eric Tyrek Jimmerson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Removal Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, state court file, #4 Exhibit B, Notice of Removal to Johnston County) (Thornton, James)
August 22, 2018 Case transferred in from Eastern Division on 08/22/2018. Case Number 4:18-cv-148. (Collins, S.)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Redesignating Division to Western Division. At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is redesignated as a Western Division case. The Honorable Louise Wood Flanagan, United States District Judge, will remain the presiding judge. All future documents shall reflect the new case number of 5: 18-CV-409-FL. No further filing shall be made in 4: 18-CV-148-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/22/2018. (Collins, S.)
August 22, 2018 Filing 6 Notice regarding 1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's counsel Karonnie R. Truzy of Crumley Roberts, LLP at 2400 Freeman Mill Road, Greensboro, NC 27406. (Rudd, D.)
August 22, 2018 Notice to Counsel - This case should have been filed in the Western division. The Clerk will enter a reassignment order correcting the error. (Rudd, D.)
August 22, 2018 Notice to Counsel regarding: 1 Notice of Removal, 2 Notice of Appearance, 3 Financial Disclosure Statement, 4 Financial Disclosure Statement, 5 Notice of Appearance - Pursuant to the E-Government Act, if the involvement of a minor child must be mentioned, only the initials of that child should be used. Counsel should refile all documents using the initials of the minor child. (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N.C. v. Jimmerson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Tyrek Jimmerson
Represented By: James C. Thornton
Represented By: Robert Hugh Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Coach LLC
Represented By: James C. Thornton
Represented By: Robert Hugh Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.C.
Represented By: Karonnie R. Truzy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celeste Vicente
Represented By: Karonnie R. Truzy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?