Dean v. Karoffa et al
Plaintiff: Jason Barrett Dean
Defendant: Process Equipment and Controls LLC and Dustin Matthew Karoffa
Case Number: 5:2018cv00443
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #9 Financial Disclosure Statement. A Certificate of Service should accompany this filing. Counsel is directed to file the Certificate of Service using the event code titled as such located under the "Service of Process" category of civil filing events. (Collins, S.)
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Dustin Matthew Karoffa, Process Equipment and Controls LLC. (Pettey, Rodney)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Process Equipment and Controls LLC (Pettey, Rodney)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Justin M. Osborn on behalf of All Defendants. (Osborn, Justin)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Rodney E. Pettey on behalf of All Defendants. (Pettey, Rodney)
October 8, 2018 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Jason Barrett Dean. Process Equipment and Controls LLC waiver sent on 9/13/2018, answer due 11/12/2018. (Ochsner, Ann)
October 8, 2018 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Jason Barrett Dean. Dustin Matthew Karoffa waiver sent on 9/13/2018, answer due 11/12/2018. (Ochsner, Ann)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Ann C. Ochsner on behalf of Jason Barrett Dean. (Ochsner, Ann)
October 1, 2018 Notice to Counsel regarding: previously issued Notice to Counsel. Ann C. Ochsner should file a Notice of Appearance. (Collins, S.)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert E. Whitley on behalf of Jason Barrett Dean. (Whitley, Robert)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jason Barrett Dean (Ochsner, Ann)
September 12, 2018 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
September 12, 2018 Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
September 12, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Jason Barrett Dean. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4654305.), filed by Jason Barrett Dean. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ochsner, Ann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean v. Karoffa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Barrett Dean
Represented By: Ann C. Ochsner
Represented By: Robert E. Whitley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Process Equipment and Controls LLC
Represented By: Rodney E. Pettey
Represented By: Justin M. Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Matthew Karoffa
Represented By: Rodney E. Pettey
Represented By: Justin M. Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?