Robertson v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Sheila Robertson
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 5:2018cv00454
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 USM-285 Form - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Nancy A. Berryhil, Acting Commissioner of Social Security on 10/11/2018. (Sellers, N.)
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 USM-285 Form - Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jeff Sessions, U.S. Attorney General on 10/10/2018. (Sellers, N.)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed by Personal Service as to Nancy A. Berryhill served on 10/11/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Sellers, N.)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 Summonses Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Sellers, N.)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by Sheila Robertson. (Sellers, N.)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 10/2/2018. (Sellers, N.)
October 2, 2018 Remark: Certified copy of #4 Order and file-stamped copies of summonses and complaint forwarded to the United States Marshal for service, along with USM-285 Forms. (Sellers, N.)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Sheila Robertson (Scurfield, Scott)
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Scott A. Scurfield on behalf of Sheila Robertson. (Scurfield, Scott)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Sheila Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Jeff Sessions, #4 Proposed Summons John Bruce, #5 Proposed Summons Nancy Berryhill, #6 US Marshal Service, #7 US Marshal Service, #8 US Marshal Service) (Scurfield, Scott)
September 20, 2018 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge James C. Dever III regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Sellers, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Robertson
Represented By: Scott A. Scurfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?