Laake v. Lulu Enterprises, Inc.
Plaintiff: John Laake
Defendant: Lulu Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv00461
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Referring Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Lulu Enterprises, Inc. filed by John Laake. (Collins, S.)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AND MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John Laake. The court grants Laake's IFP motion. The undersigned recommends the district court dismiss Laake's sole claim against Lulu Enterprises. Objections to Memorandum and Recommendations due by 12/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 11/19/2018. (A copy of this Order and M&R was sent via US mail to John Laake, 469 Grand Ave., Aurora, IL 60506.) (Collins, S.)
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by John Laake. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Collins, S.)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Self-Representation filed by John Laake. (Collins, S.)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - At the direction of the Court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is reassigned to the Honorable Louise Wood Flanagan, United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. Chief United States District Judge James C. Dever III is no longer assigned to the case. All future documents shall reflect the revised case number of 5:18-CV-461-FL. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/5/2018. (Sellers, N.)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John Laake. Motion referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 10/2/2018. Sent to John Laake at 469 Grand Ave. Aurora, IL 60506 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
September 28, 2018 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge James C. Dever III regarding #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Sellers, N.)
September 27, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to John Laake. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.)
September 27, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. A party who is proceeding without an attorney shall file a notice of self representation pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(b). (Rudd, D.)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (short form), filed by John Laake. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Errata A- Various Emails, #3 Exhibit B- Email from Lulu.com, #4 Exhibit C- Email from Lulu.com, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 cover letter, #8 Envelope) (Rudd, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laake v. Lulu Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Laake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lulu Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?