UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Gentry et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: B. Perry Gentry and Benjamin Gentry
Case Number: 5:2018cv00528
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Malcolm J Howard
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 Proposed Order regarding #6 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Choksi, Kunal)
December 17, 2018 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #6 Motion for Entry of Default. At the direction of the court, counsel shall file a proposed order. The order must be filed electronically using the event PROPOSED ORDER located in the RESPONSES AND REPLIES category. Additionally, the judge's practice preferences MAY require counsel to email the proposed order in a word processing format. (Rudd, D.)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kunal J. Choksi) (Choksi, Kunal)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Benjamin Gentry served on 11/17/2018, answer due 12/8/2018. (Choksi, Kunal)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. B. Perry Gentry served on 11/17/2018, answer due 12/8/2018. (Choksi, Kunal)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Kunal J. Choksi on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Choksi, Kunal)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to B. Perry Gentry, Benjamin Gentry. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
November 5, 2018 Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B. Perry Gentry, Benjamin Gentry, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons B. Perry Gentry, #2 Proposed Summons Benjamin Gentry, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Choksi, Kunal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Gentry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Perry Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Kunal J. Choksi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?