Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 1.747 Acres, More or Less, In Johnston County, North Carolina et al
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Defendant: Flonnie Louise Godwin, Gail Godwin Clark, Margaret Godwin Chase, Theresa Godwin Englert, Marcia Godwin Williams, Joseph E. Godwin, Linda Godwin Coleman, James E. Godwin, 1.747 Acres, More or Less, In Johnston County, North Carolina and Janet Godwin Earnheart
Case Number: 5:2018cv00555
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 14 WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. regarding #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC (Kitchin, Henry)
January 2, 2019 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Dhamian A. Blue on behalf of Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Blue, Dhamian)
December 14, 2018 Filing 12 Notice filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC proof of service on Theresa Godwin Englert by certified mail on November 23, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service, #2 Attachment 1 - Return Receipt) (Kitchin, Henry)
December 14, 2018 Filing 11 Notice filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC regarding proof of service on Linda Godwin Coleman by certified mail on November 23, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service, #2 Attachment 1 - Return Receipt) (Kitchin, Henry)
December 12, 2018 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Stouch, L.)
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 Notice filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC regarding proof of service of Gail Godwin Clark on November 21, 2018, by certified mail. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service, #2 Attachment 1 - Return Receipt) (Kitchin, Henry)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support regarding #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support regarding #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 Appendix to the Statement of Facts regarding #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Project Director Brian Wright, #2 Exhibit 2 - FERC Certificate, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Land Agent Jeffrey Arrington) (Kitchin, Henry)
November 19, 2018 Filing 5 Statement of Material Facts regarding #4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
November 19, 2018 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Henry L. Kitchin, Jr on behalf of Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dominion Energy, Inc., Corporate Parent Duke Energy Corp., Corporate Parent Southern Company for Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4729485.), filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index to Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 - Depiction of the Property, #3 Exhibit 2 - FERC Certificate, #4 Exhibit 3 - Map Depicting Route of ACP Project, #5 Exhibit 4 - Plat of Easements on the Property, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Notice of Filing of Complaint in Condemnation, #8 Notice Regarding Use of Notice of Filing) (Kitchin, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 1.747 Acres, More or Less, In Johnston County, North Carolina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flonnie Louise Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Godwin Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Godwin Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Godwin Englert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Godwin Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph E. Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Godwin Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Godwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.747 Acres, More or Less, In Johnston County, North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Godwin Earnheart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: Henry L. Kitchin, Jr.
Represented By: Dhamian A. Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?