Ward v. State of North Carolina
Petitioner: Terro D. Ward
Respondent: State of North Carolina
Case Number: 5:2018hc02184
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: xxU.S. Outside District
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 Filing 9 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - This action is hereby dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/31/2018. Copy sent via US Mail to Terro D. Ward, 803 Lincoln Street, Wilson, NC 27893. (Love, L.)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE - The court DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE the action for failure to prosecute and DIRECTS the clerk to close the case. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/30/2018. Copy sent via US Mail to Terro D. Ward, 803 Lincoln Street, Wilson, NC 27893. (Love, L.)
August 30, 2018 Case Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle for review. (Love, L.)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DEFICIENCY. (1) The papers are not on the forms prescribed for use by this court and (2) The filing fee of $5.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Response due by 8/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 7/20/2018. Copy served via US Mail, along with forms: Terro D. Ward, 803 Lincoln Street, Wilson, NC 27893. (Castania, M)
July 19, 2018 Filing 6 Letter regarding case transfer sent via US Mail to Terro D. Ward, 803 Lincoln Street, Wilson, NC 27893. (Love, L.)
July 19, 2018 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern. Case Number 2:18-cv-02597. transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF NORTH CAROLINA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 2241(D). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 7/18/18. 7/18/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PETITIONER. (er, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/19/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/19/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 2 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by TERRO D. WARD BEY. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/19/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by TERRO D. WARD BEY..(jwl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/19/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terro D. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?