Jennings v. United States of America Republic Corporation

Petitioner: Brandon Marquis Jennings
Respondent: United States of America Republic Corporation
Case Number: 5:2018hc02251
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 10 Notice of Change of Address to Piedmont Regional Jail filed by Brandon Marquis Jennings. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M)
November 15, 2018 9 Notice of Change of Address filed by Brandon Marquis Jennings. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M)
November 5, 2018 8 Notice of Change of Address filed by Brandon Marquis Jennings. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M)
October 30, 2018 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Brandon Marquis Jennings. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M)
October 26, 2018 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan: #6 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus. (Castania, M)
October 26, 2018 6 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus filed by Brandon Marquis Jennings. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M)
October 24, 2018 Case Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan for initial review. As soon as review is completed by the court, an order will enter and the next appropriate step will be taken. (Castania, M)
October 24, 2018 5 TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Castania, M)
October 24, 2018 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Brandon Marquis Jennings. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER OF DEFICIENCY - The filing fee of $5.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Correction due by 11/6/2018. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/16/2018. Copy served via US Mail, along with form application: Brandon Marquis Jennings 352381, Wake County Detention Center, P.O. Box 2479, Raleigh, NC 27602. (Castania, M)
October 15, 2018 2 Letter to petitioner regarding filing of petition. (Castania, M)
October 15, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Brandon Marquis Jennings. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennings v. United States of America Republic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America Republic Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brandon Marquis Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?