Judd v. Crumley et al

Plaintiff: James Arthur Judd
Defendant: Alexandr F. Crumley, Robert J. Higdon, Jr., Mitchell G. Styers and Peter A. Moore, Jr.
Case Number: 5:2019ct03044
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Change of Address filed by James Arthur Judd. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
April 3, 2019 Filing 16 Document: Supporting Grounds for Civil Case filed by James Arthur Judd. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
March 28, 2019 Filing 15 Document: Supporting Grounds to Civil Case filed by James Arthur Judd. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 Document in support of civil case filed by James Arthur Judd. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support regarding #1 Complaint filed by James Arthur Judd. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Change of Address filed by James Arthur Judd. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
March 12, 2019 Case Submitted to Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II for complaint review. (Indig, A.)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 Supporting Grounds for Case and Notice of Change of Address filed by James Arthur Judd. Plaintiff is now located at Western Tidewater Regional Jail. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope) (Love, L.)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 3/4/2019. Copy served via US Mail on plaintiff and trust fund account supervisor (certified copy) at Albemarle District Jail. (Castania, M)
March 4, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II regarding #4 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Love, L.)
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (Attachments: #1 Albemarle District Jail Booking Report, #2 Envelope) (Love, L.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 Document in Support of Complaint filed by James Arthur Judd. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Indig, A.)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act). Response to Order due by 3/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 2/25/2019. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 INCOMPLETE Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by James Arthur Judd. (Indig, A.)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by James Arthur Judd. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Deficiency. You must either file an application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit or pay $400.00. Response due by 3/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 2/12/2019. Copy sent to plaintiff at Albemarle District Jail. (Indig, A.)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to James Arthur Judd at Albemarle District Jail. (Indig, A.)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alexandr F. Crumley, Robert J. Higdon, Jr., Peter A. Moore, Jr. and Mitchell G. Styers filed by James Arthur Judd. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Judd v. Crumley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Arthur Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandr F. Crumley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Higdon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell G. Styers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter A. Moore, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?