Fuller v. Thomas
Plaintiff: Michael George Fuller
Defendant: Scott Thomas
Case Number: 5:2019ct03317
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Case Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan for frivolity review. As soon as the screening is concluded, an order will issue and the next appropriate step will be taken. (Docket sheet mailed to plaintiff.) (Castania, M)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 12/2/2019. Copy to plaintiff and to Craven County Detention Center. (Castania, M)
December 2, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. - #2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Castania, M)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Michael George Fuller. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M)
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED from Craven County Detention Center. (Castania, M)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) - Response to Order due by 12/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 11/18/2019. Copy to plaintiff and to Inmate Trust Fund Account Officer. (Castania, M)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Order - SIGNED #2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Michael George Fuller. (Attachment: #1 Envelopes) (Castania, M)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of Deficiency. The application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit is not signed. Document returned for your signature. Response due by 11/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 10/31/2019. Copy of order and form sent via US Mail to plaintiff at Craven County Detention Center. (Indig, A.)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Michael George Fuller at Craven County Detention Center. (Indig, A.)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION (unsigned) to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Michael George Fuller. (Indig, A.)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Scott Thomas filed by Michael George Fuller. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuller v. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael George Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?