Jeri v. Finley et al
Plaintiff: Max Jeri
Defendant: John Doe, Scott Finley, Assistant Director, Deborah G. Schult and Kathleen Hawk Sawyer
Amicus Curiae: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2019ct03325
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Case Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle for complaint review. (Copy of docket sheet mailed to plaintiff.) (Castania, M)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 Letter to plaintiff regarding transfer of case and new case number. (Castania, M)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle. Case Number 1:19-cv-01805. transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) that this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on November 5, 2019. (kjn) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/5/2019.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM - re: Jeris requests for injunctive relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on November 5, 2019. (kjn) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/5/2019.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Butler, Michael) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/5/2019.]
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399) Mailed to Scott Finley, John Doe, Kathleen Hawk Sawyer, Deborah G. Schult. Waiver of Service due by 11/20/2019. (kjn) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/5/2019.]
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants / Order Granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Max Jeri. The Complaint is deemed filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 21, 2019. (kjn) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/5/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER (Attachments: #1 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice)(aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/5/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/5/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Max Jeri.(aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/5/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR EMERGENCY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Max Jeri. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(aaa) Modified on 10/17/2019 (aaa). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 11/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeri v. Finley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Jeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assistant Director, Deborah G. Schult
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Hawk Sawyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?