Steele v. Williams
Plaintiff: Jodie L. Steele, II
Defendant: Abby Williams
Case Number: 5:2019ct03336
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Case Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan for frivolity review. As soon as the screening is concluded, an order will issue and the next appropriate step will be taken. (Docket sheet mailed to plaintiff.) (Castania, M)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 12/2/2019. Copy to plaintiff and to NC Department of Public Safety. (Castania, M)
December 2, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. - #2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Castania, M)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jodie L. Steele, II. (Castania, M)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED from NC Department of Public Safety. (Castania, M)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act) - Response to Order due by 12/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 11/19/2019. Copy to plaintiff and to NC Department of Public Safety. (Castania, M)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Jodie L. Steele, II at Dan River Prison Work Farm. (Indig, A.)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Jodie L. Steele, II. (Attachment: #1 Declaration in Support) (Indig, A.)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Abby Williams filed by Jodie L. Steele, II. (Attachments: #1 Complaint - not on form, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steele v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abby Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodie L. Steele, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?