Rogers v. New Hanover County et al
Plaintiff: Ray Clarence Rogers
Defendant: Officer McDonald, Lieutenant Wilson, Chief Deputy, Sheriff Edward McMahon, Officer M. Connolly, New Hanover County and McDaniel Supply Company
Case Number: 5:2019ct03353
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 11 Letter from plaintiff requesting copy of docket sheet. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Courtesy copy of docket sheet mailed to plaintiff.) (Castania, M)
January 21, 2020 Filing 10 Letter from plaintiff regarding mail tampering. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from plaintiff regarding mail tampering. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 Letter from plaintiff regarding mail being forwarded to the classification office. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from petitioner regarding status of case. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M)
December 2, 2019 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan: #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (Castania, M)
December 2, 2019 Case Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan for frivolity review. As soon as the screening is concluded, an order will issue and the next appropriate step will be taken. (Docket sheet mailed to plaintiff.) (Castania, M)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 12/2/2019. Copy to plaintiff and to inmate trust fund account supervisor at New Hanover County Jail. (Castania, M)
November 27, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. - #2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Castania, M)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Ray Clarence Rogers at New Hanover County Jail. (Indig, A.)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION and Memorandum in Support for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Ray Clarence Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Indig, A.)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement filed by Ray Clarence Rogers. (Indig, A.)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Ray Clarence Rogers. (Indig, A.)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chief Deputy, M. Connolly, McDaniel Supply Company, Officer McDonald, Edward McMahon, New Hanover County and Lieutenant Wilson filed by Ray Clarence Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. New Hanover County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Deputy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Edward McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer M. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Hanover County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDaniel Supply Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Clarence Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?