Salimabdu Gould et al v. State of North Carolina et al
Plaintiff: SALIMABDU GOULD and Abdu-Salim Gould
Defendant: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA PRISON LEGAL SERVICE, INC., STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA OFFICE OF THE APPELLATE DEFENDER, Ed Pittman, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF THE COURTS, Naomi Wiggins, William Harris, State of North Carolina, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA DEPTARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, Greg Adkins, Willie Davis, NC Court of Appeals, Supreme Court of North Carolina, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA INDIGENT DEFENSE SERVICE and BERTIE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT FOR THE STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Case Number: 5:2019ct03360
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 14 Document: "Notice of Claim of Discharge" filed by Abdu-Salim Gould. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 Letter from Abdu-Salim Gould regarding legal mail. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Change of Address filed by Abdu-Salim Gould. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Edwards, S.)
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Abdu-Salim Gould regarding transfer to another facility. (Edwards, S.)
December 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend filed by Abdu-Salim Gould. (Indig, A.)
December 17, 2019 Filing 9 Notice - Plaintiff Entry of Appearance - Special Appearance filed by Abdu-Salim Gould. (Indig, A.)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support of Claims filed by Abdu-Salim Gould. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Documents in Support, #3 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
December 17, 2019 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #10 MOTION to Amend. (Indig, A.)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Directing Payments be made from Prison Account of Abdu-Salim Gould. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 12/4/2019. Copy to plaintiff and to NC Department of Public Safety. (Castania, M)
December 4, 2019 Case Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle for complaint review. As soon as the screening is concluded, an order will issue and the next appropriate step will be taken. (Docket sheet mailed to plaintiff.) (Castania, M)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Abdu-Salim Gould at Scotland Correctional Institution. (Indig, A.)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia. Case Number 1:19-cv-02864. transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
December 3, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Indig, A.)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Eastern District of North Carolina. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 12/3/2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/08/2019. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/3/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 PARTIAL PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by ABDU-SALIM GOULD (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/3/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ABDU-SALIM GOULD (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/3/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by ABDU-SALIM GOULD. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/3/2019.]
September 17, 2019 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 09/17/2019. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 12/3/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salimabdu Gould et al v. State of North Carolina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA PRISON LEGAL SERVICE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA OFFICE OF THE APPELLATE DEFENDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF THE COURTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naomi Wiggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA DEPTARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NC Court of Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supreme Court of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA INDIGENT DEFENSE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERTIE COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT FOR THE STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALIMABDU GOULD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdu-Salim Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?