Pennell v. WakeMed
Plaintiff: Denise Pennell
Defendant: WakeMed
Case Number: 5:2019cv00006
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support regarding #14 MOTION to Stay regarding #12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by WakeMed. (Shad, Kerry)
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay regarding #12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by WakeMed. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Shad, Kerry)
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support regarding #12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by WakeMed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pennell Charge, #2 Exhibit B - Darrow v. Ashcroft) (Shad, Kerry)
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by WakeMed. (Shad, Kerry)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 3/13/19. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/6/2019. (Collins, S.)
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by WakeMed. (Shad, Kerry)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Denise Pennell (Monteith, Charles)
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Charles E. Monteith, Jr on behalf of Denise Pennell. (Monteith, Charles)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. WakeMed answer due 2/5/2019. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/8/2019. (Collins, S.)
January 8, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Tripp, S.)
January 8, 2019 Filing 6 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal - Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's counsel, Charles E. Monteith, Jr., via U.S. Mail at Monteith Law, PLLC, 9121 Anson Way, Suite 200, Raleigh, NC 27615. (Tripp, S.)
January 8, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.)
January 8, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Taylor M Dewberry on behalf of WakeMed. (Dewberry, Taylor)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by WakeMed (Shad, Kerry)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by WakeMed. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Shad, Kerry)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Kerry A. Shad on behalf of WakeMed. (Shad, Kerry)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WakeMed from Wake County Superior Court, case number 18 CVS 14614. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4781590), filed by WakeMed. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A - Civil Summons, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit C - Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet D - Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit E - Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Shad, Kerry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennell v. WakeMed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WakeMed
Represented By: Taylor M Dewberry
Represented By: Kerry A. Shad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Pennell
Represented By: Charles E. Monteith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?