Willis v. United States Postal Service
Plaintiff: Valerie Willis
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Case Number: 5:2019cv00016
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition entitled 'Notice to Reject Dismissal Request' regarding #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Valerie Willis. (Stouch, L.)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 Notice filed by United States Postal Service regarding #10 Memorandum in Support, (Notice of Supplemental Information). (Harris, John)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 Rule 12 Letter Issued to Valerie Willis as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Response due by 3/11/2019. Copy sent via US Mail to Valerie Willis at 5909 Holly Drive, Raleigh, NC 27616. (Stouch, L.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support regarding #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Kimberly A. Herbst, #2 Exhibit B - Notification Letter) (Harris, John)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by United States Postal Service. (Harris, John)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement filed by Valerie Willis. (Stouch, L.)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Self-Representation filed by Valerie Willis (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Stouch, L.)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant has up to and including February 19, 2019, in which to respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/18/2019. Copy sent to Valerie Willis via US Mail to 5909 Holly Drive, Raleigh, NC 27616. (Stouch, L.)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to have pro se plaintiff file a notice of self representation and financial disclosure statement mailed via US Mail to Valeria Willis at 5909 Holly Drive, Raleigh, NC 27616 on January 18, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
January 18, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: [1-2] Civil Cover Sheet - Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the JS44 Civil Cover Sheet prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No action needed at this time. (Rudd, D.)
January 18, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Stouch, L.)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Harris, John)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 Notice filed by United States Postal Service regarding #1 Notice of Removal, 1/17/18 Letter to Wake Co. Clerk-Small Claims Court. (Harris, John)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by John E. Harris on behalf of United States Postal Service. (Harris, John)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Postal Service from Wake County Small Claims Court, case number 18 C 19114., filed by United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Summons & Complaint filed in Wake Co. Small Claims Court, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Harris, John) (Attachment 2 flattened and replaced on 1/18/2019) (Edwards, S.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: John E. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?