Petite v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Jamila Petite
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00019
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time #9 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including April 1, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/12/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
March 12, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Collins, S.)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint,,, filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Haynes, Sonny)
February 13, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time #8 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant shall have up to and including March 18, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/13/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
February 12, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Collins, S.)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint,,, filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bondurant, Elizabeth)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Sonny S. Haynes on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Haynes, Sonny)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Elizabeth J. Bondurant on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Bondurant, Elizabeth)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service for Initial Pleadings filed by Jamila Petite served on Metropolitan Life on 01/28/2019. (Nabors, Darryl)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
January 23, 2019 Notice to Counsel - Pursuant to Local Rule 10.1(c), except for the initial filing, all pleadings, motions, discovery procedures, notices, memoranda and other papers filed with the clerk of court shall bear the case number assigned by the clerk. No action required at this time. (Rudd, D.)
January 22, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.)
January 18, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number RAL069295. (Agiovlassitis, J.)
January 18, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jamila Petite (Nabors, Darryl)
January 18, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Darryl T. Nabors on behalf of Jamila Petite. (Nabors, Darryl)
January 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Jamila Petite. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Index Of Exhibits, #4 Exhibit A-LTD Plan, #5 Exhibit B-Job Description, #6 Exhibit C-Raleigh Neurology 9/28/16, #7 Exhibit D-Raleigh Neurology 10/22/16, #8 Exhibit E-West Cary Psychiatry 10/10/16, #9 Exhibit F-Duke Spine 1/3/17, #10 Exhibit G-West Cary Psychiatry 2/13/17, #11 Exhibit H-Behavioral Assessment 3/6/17, #12 Exhibit I-Dr. Nunez Letter 4/11/17, #13 Exhibit J-Nan Allen Notes 4/18/17, #14 Exhibit K-Behavioral Assessment 5/22/17, #15 Exhibit L-MetLife Denial Letter 6/22/17, #16 Exhibit M-Duke Progress Note 7/19/17, #17 Exhibit N-Duke Office Visit 10/19/17, #18 Exhibit O-MetLife Final Denial Letter 2/28/18) (Nabors, Darryl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petite v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamila Petite
Represented By: Darryl T. Nabors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bondurant
Represented By: Sonny S. Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?