Hiss v. Logan
Appellant: Jason Michael Hiss
Appellee: John F. Logan
Interested Party: Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler
Case Number: 5:2019cv00037
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Filing 13 Notice to Parties Regarding Filing of Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Briefs must be filed in accordance with Rule 8018 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. (Sellers, N.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 Certificate of Readiness and Completion of Record filed by the Bankruptcy Court. (Donleycott, S.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 11 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Donleycott, S.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 10 Transmitting copy of docket sheet. The Bankruptcy Court certifies that this is a true and accurate copy of the docket on file. (Donleycott, S.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 SEALED BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 18, 2018, before Judge David M. Warren. Court Reporter/Transcriber Access Transcripts, LLC. This document must be accessed through the originating Bankruptcy Court. (Donleycott, S.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 8 Appellee's Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. (Attachments: #1 Documents 1-4 from Designation) (Donleycott, S.)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 Appellant's Bankruptcy Record on Appeal filed. (Attachments: #1 Documents 1-8 from Designation) (Donleycott, S.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by John F. Logan (Burnett, Michael)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael Brandon Burnett on behalf of John F. Logan. (Burnett, Michael)
February 18, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Jason Michael Hiss (Sasser, Travis)
February 18, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Travis Philip Sasser on behalf of Jason Michael Hiss. (Sasser, Travis)
February 13, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Docketing and Briefing Deadline regarding #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Rudd, D.)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 16-05736-5-DMW. (Attachments: #1 Judge David M. Warren's Order dated February 11, 2019) (Donleycott, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hiss v. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jason Michael Hiss
Represented By: Travis Philip Sasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John F. Logan
Represented By: Stephanie Elizabeth Goodbar
Represented By: Michael Brandon Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Clerk of Court Stephanie Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?