Adkins v. Chase Bank USA, N.A., et al.
Plaintiff: Donnie L Adkins
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00065
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Donnie L Adkins (Edwards, Asa)
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Chase Bank USA, N.A. (Anderson, Scott)
March 26, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A.'s Consent Motion for Extension of Time #5 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that this defendant has up to and including April 25, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/26/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
March 26, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #6 Notice of Appearance. Counsel should refer to Pages 5 and 6 of the CM/ECF User's Manual for instructions on updating law firm information. Once updated, the new contact information will be reflected on the docket of all cases in which counsel entered an appearance. (Collins, S.)
March 26, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Collins, S.)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Enloe, Caren)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Enloe, Caren)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Caren D. Enloe on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Enloe, Caren)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Anderson, Scott)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Chase Bank USA, N.A., Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Donnie L Adkins (Edwards, Asa)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Asa Covington Edwards, IV on behalf of Donnie L Adkins. (Edwards, Asa)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4847834.), filed by Donnie L Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons as to Chase Bank USA, N.A., #3 Proposed Summons as to Equifax Information Services LLC, #4 Proposed Summons as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.) (Edwards, Asa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adkins v. Chase Bank USA, N.A., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie L Adkins
Represented By: Asa Covington Edwards, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Caren D. Enloe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Scott D. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?