Nelson v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al

Plaintiff: Polly Nelson
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America and Kindred Healthcare Operating, Inc., Employee Medical and Welfare Benefits Plan
Case Number: 5:2019cv00068
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING - Discovery Plan due by 5/27/19. Counsel should read attached order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 4/22/2019. (Collins, S.)
April 18, 2019 Filing 10 Financial Disclosure Statement by Unum Life Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Unum Group for Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Dean, James)
April 18, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Dean, James)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Polly Nelson as to Kindred Healthcare Operating, Inc., Employee Medical and Welfare Benefits Plan. (Matesic, Rachel)
March 28, 2019 TEXT ORDER granting Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time #7 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendants have up to and including April 18, 2019, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/28/2019. (Hockaday, A.)
March 27, 2019 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Collins, S.)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint filed by Kindred Healthcare Operating, Inc., Employee Medical and Welfare Benefits Plan, Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Niland, Ryan)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Ryan Hunter Niland on behalf of Kindred Healthcare Operating, Inc., Employee Medical and Welfare Benefits Plan, Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Niland, Ryan)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by James A. Dean on behalf of All Defendants. (Dean, James)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kindred Healthcare Operating, Inc., Employee Medical and Welfare Benefits Plan, Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
February 28, 2019 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
February 27, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number RAL070063. (Agiovlassitis, J.)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Rachel C. Matesic on behalf of Polly Nelson. (Matesic, Rachel)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Polly Nelson (Matesic, Rachel)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Polly Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons on Defendant Unum, #2 Proposed Summons on Plan, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Matesic, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polly Nelson
Represented By: Rachel C. Matesic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: James A. Dean
Represented By: Ryan Hunter Niland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kindred Healthcare Operating, Inc., Employee Medical and Welfare Benefits Plan
Represented By: James A. Dean
Represented By: Ryan Hunter Niland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?