Islet Sciences, Inc. v. Avolynt, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Islet Sciences, Inc.
Defendant: Brighthaven Ventures, LLC., William Wilkison, James Green and Avolynt, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00145
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 57 Notice to Parties regarding Transfer of Case to the Eastern District of North Carolina. Counsel should read the notice in its entirety for additional information. (Rudd, D.)
April 11, 2019 Filing 56 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern. Case Number 1:19-cv-00337. Transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
April 9, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Eastern District of North Carolina (jwh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 55 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #54 Letter filed by Islet Sciences, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/9/2019) (jwh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 54 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Alexandra S. Wald dated April 8, 2019 re: Conditional Consent to Transfer. Document filed by Islet Sciences, Inc..(Wald, Alexandra) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 53 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #13 Amended Complaint, against Avolynt, Inc., Brighthaven Ventures, LLC., James Green, William Wilkison with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Islet Sciences, Inc.. Related document: #13 Amended Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Villegas, Francisco) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER, It is hereby ORDERED that by April 4, 2019, Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, with amendments limited to new allegations related to the purported basis for diversity jurisdiction. It is further ORDERED that the briefing schedule issued by the Court on March 7, 2019, ECF No. 32, is hereby modified as follows: 1. By April 11, 2019, Defendants shall file their motion; 2. By April 25, 2019, Plaintiff shall file its opposition; 3. By May 2, 2019, Defendants shall file their reply. From a review of the parties' letters, however, see ECF Nos. 26, 31, 44-46, 49, 51, and considering Plaintiff's shifting explanation of its jurisdictional ties to New York, Plaintiff has made little showing of why this action should be litigated in this District, and it appears that Defendants will make a compelling argument in their motion for a transfer to the Eastern District of North Carolina on forum non conveniens grounds. In the interest of judicial economy, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall discuss whether they consent to transfer to that district, and by April 8, 2019, the parties shall file a letter advising the Court of the outcome of that discussion. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 4/4/2019., Motions due by 4/11/2019., Responses due by 4/25/2019, Replies due by 5/2/2019.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/2/19) (yv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 51 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael D. Margulies dated April 2, 2019 re: Plaintiff's Request Seeking Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Avolynt, Inc., Brighthaven Ventures, LLC., James Green, William Wilkison.(Margulies, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
April 1, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #51 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (kv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #49 Letter filed by Islet Sciences, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: By April 2, 2019, Defendants shall file a letter stating their position on whether Plaintiff should be granted leave to amend its complaint to add additional allegations concerning the basis for diversity jurisdiction. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 4/1/2019) (kv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 49 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Alexandra Wald dated March 29, 2019 re: Supplemental Islet Sciences, Inc. Corporate Information. Document filed by Islet Sciences, Inc..(Wald, Alexandra) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a magistrate judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). All fact discovery shall be completed no later than July 26, 2019. Depositions to be completed by July 26, 2019. All expert discovery shall be completed no later than September 9, 2019. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is: 1-2 weeks. The next Case Management Conference is scheduled for September 4, 2019 at 10:40 a.m. (As further set forth in this Order.) Deposition due by 7/26/2019. Fact Discovery due by 7/26/2019. Expert Discovery due by 9/9/2019. Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2019 at 10:40 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/28/2019) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Analisa Torres: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/28/2019. (DCM) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 46 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Marvin J. Lowenthal dated March 28, 2019 re: Response to Defendants' March 27, 2019 Letter regarding Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Document filed by Islet Sciences, Inc..(Lowenthal, Marvin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 45 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael D. Margulies dated March 27, 2019 re: Plaintiff's Purported Basis for Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Document filed by Avolynt, Inc., Brighthaven Ventures, LLC., James Green, William Wilkison.(Margulies, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 44 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Marvin J. Lowenthal dated March 26, 2019 re: Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Document filed by Islet Sciences, Inc..(Lowenthal, Marvin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #42 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for March 25, 2019 is ADJOURNED to March 28, 2019, at 11:20 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 3/28/2019 at 11:20 AM before Judge Analisa Torres.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/20/2019) (jca) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 42 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael D. Margulies dated March 20, 2019. Document filed by Avolynt, Inc., Brighthaven Ventures, LLC., James Green, William Wilkison.(Margulies, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: The initial pretrial conference scheduled for March 21, 2019 is ADJOURNED to March 25, 2019, at 11:20 a.m. Initial Conference set for 3/25/2019 at 11:20 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/19/2019) (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 40 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Francisco Villegas dated March 14, 2019 re: Initial Conference. Document filed by Islet Sciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order)(Villegas, Francisco) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 39 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Marvin J. Lowenthal dated March 13, 2019 re: Magistrate Judge. Document filed by Islet Sciences, Inc..(Lowenthal, Marvin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #35 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED in part, DENIED in part. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for March 20, 2019 is ADJOURNED to March 21, 2019, at 10:40 a.m. By March 14, 2019, the parties shall submit their joint letter and proposed case management plan. Initial Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 10:40 AM before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/7/2019) (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marvin Jules Lowenthal on behalf of Islet Sciences, Inc.. (Lowenthal, Marvin) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexandra Sarah Wald on behalf of Islet Sciences, Inc.. (Wald, Alexandra) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 35 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Francisco Villegas dated March 7, 2019. Document filed by Islet Sciences, Inc..(Villegas, Francisco) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Megan E.A. Bishop to Appear Pro Hac Vice: GRANTED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (DCM) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 7, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #33 MOTION for Megan E.A. Bishop to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Megan E.A. Bishop to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Avolynt, Inc., Brighthaven Ventures, LLC., James Green, William Wilkison. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bishop, Megan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 4/4/2019. Responses due by 4/18/2019. Replies due by 4/25/2019. (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER. Having reviewed Defendants' pre-motion letter dated February 27, 2019, ECF No. 26, and Plaintiff's response dated March 6, 2019, ECF No. 31, it is hereby ORDERED that: 1. By April 4, 2019, Defendants shall file their motion; 2. By April 18, 2019, Plaintiff shall file its opposition; and 3. By April 25, 2019, Defendants shall file their reply, if any. The Court shall not stay discovery pending its resolution of Defendants' motion. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 26 & 31. SO ORDERED. Terminating #31 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File opposition to motion to dismiss (Re: Dkt #26) addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Francisco Villegas dated March 6, 2019. Document filed by Islet Sciences, Inc.; Terminating #26 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael D. Margulies dated February 27, 2019. Document filed by Avolynt, Inc., Brighthaven Ventures, LLC., James Green, William Wilkison. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/7/2019) (rjm) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 31 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Leave to File opposition to motion to dismiss (Re: Dkt #26) addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Francisco Villegas dated March 6, 2019. Document filed by Islet Sciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Villegas, Francisco) Modified on 4/4/2019 (db). [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 6, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #30 MOTION for Megan E.A. Bishop to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16448510. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supeme Court of North Carolina;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 30 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Megan E.A. Bishop to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16448510. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Avolynt, Inc., Brighthaven Ventures, LLC., James Green, William Wilkison. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bishop, Megan) Modified on 3/6/2019 (wb). [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: The initial pretrial conference scheduled for March 20, 2019, at 3:40 p.m. is RESCHEDULED to March 20, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. By March 13, 2019, the parties shall file their joint letter and proposed case management plan. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 3/20/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Analisa Torres.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/4/2019) (ne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Kirk Alan Parry to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Analisa Torres)(Text Only Order) (DCM) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 4, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #27 MOTION for Kirk Alan Parry to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16438780. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Kirk Alan Parry to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16438780. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Avolynt, Inc., Brighthaven Ventures, LLC., James Green, William Wilkison. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission PHC Alan Parry)(Parry, Kirk) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 26 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Michael D. Margulies dated February 27, 2019. Document filed by Avolynt, Inc., Brighthaven Ventures, LLC., James Green, William Wilkison.(Margulies, Michael) Modified on 3/22/2019 (db). [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Novack on behalf of Avolynt, Inc., Brighthaven Ventures, LLC., James Green, William Wilkison. (Novack, Robert) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael David Margulies on behalf of Avolynt, Inc., Brighthaven Ventures, LLC., James Green, William Wilkison. (Margulies, Michael) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Memo Endorsement Re: Letter Request for Extension of Time for Defendants to Serve a Responsive Pleading to the First Amended Complaint served on All Defendants on February 6, 2019. Service was made by first class mail. Document filed by Islet Sciences, Inc.. (Villegas, Francisco) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #21 Letter, filed by Brighthaven Ventures, LLC., William Wilkison, James Green, Avolynt, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. By February 28, 2019, Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. (Avolynt, Inc. answer due 2/28/2019; Brighthaven Ventures, LLC. answer due 2/28/2019; James Green answer due 2/28/2019; William Wilkison answer due 2/28/2019.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/6/2019) (anc) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 21 LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Robert Novack dated February 5, 2019 re: request for extension of time for Defendants to serve a responsive pleading to the First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Avolynt, Inc., Brighthaven Ventures, LLC., James Green, William Wilkison.(Novack, Robert) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint, Complaint. Brighthaven Ventures, LLC. served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019. Service was accepted by James Green. Document filed by Islet Sciences, Inc.. (Villegas, Francisco) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint, Complaint. James Green served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019. Service was accepted by James Green. Document filed by Islet Sciences, Inc.. (Villegas, Francisco) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint, Complaint. William Wilkison served on 1/19/2019, answer due 2/11/2019. Service was accepted by William Wilkison. Document filed by Islet Sciences, Inc.. (Villegas, Francisco) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. Avolynt, Inc. served on 1/17/2019, answer due 2/7/2019. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Managing Agent. Document filed by Islet Sciences, Inc.. (Villegas, Francisco) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 18, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Avolynt, Inc. served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Managing Agent. Document filed by Islet Sciences, Inc.. (Villegas, Francisco) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order.) The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/17/2019) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 3/20/2019 at 03:40 PM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/17/2019) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Avolynt, Inc., Brighthaven Ventures, LLC., James Green, William Wilkison with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Islet Sciences, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Villegas, Francisco) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: By January 28, 2019, Plaintiff shall amend its complaint to allege the principal place of business and state of incorporation of Avolynt, Inc., and the citizenship of each constituent person or entity of BHV. If Plaintiff fails to truthfully allege complete diversity by this date, the complaint will be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. ( Amended Pleadings due by 1/28/2019.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/14/2019) (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James Green. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to William Wilkison. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brighthaven Ventures, LLC.. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Avolynt, Inc.. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 14, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James Green, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Islet Sciences, Inc.. (Villegas, Francisco) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to William Wilkison, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Islet Sciences, Inc.. (Villegas, Francisco) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brighthaven Ventures, LLC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Islet Sciences, Inc.. (Villegas, Francisco) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Avolynt, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Islet Sciences, Inc.. (Villegas, Francisco) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Islet Sciences, Inc..(Villegas, Francisco) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Villegas, Francisco) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Avolynt, Inc., Brighthaven Ventures, LLC., James Green, William Wilkison. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16180753)Document filed by Islet Sciences, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Villegas, Francisco) [Transferred from New York Southern on 4/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Islet Sciences, Inc. v. Avolynt, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brighthaven Ventures, LLC.
Represented By: Megan Bishop
Represented By: Robert Novack
Represented By: Michael David Margulies
Represented By: Kirk Alan Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Wilkison
Represented By: Megan Bishop
Represented By: Robert Novack
Represented By: Michael David Margulies
Represented By: Kirk Alan Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Green
Represented By: Megan Bishop
Represented By: Robert Novack
Represented By: Michael David Margulies
Represented By: Kirk Alan Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avolynt, Inc.
Represented By: Megan Bishop
Represented By: Robert Novack
Represented By: Michael David Margulies
Represented By: Kirk Alan Parry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Islet Sciences, Inc.
Represented By: Alexandra Sarah Wald
Represented By: Marvin Jules Lowenthal
Represented By: Francisco Arturo Villegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?