McCullough et al v. Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc.

Plaintiff: Anita Fleming, Ella Godley, Dawn McCullough and Clara Meekins
Defendant: Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00213
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Plaintiffs to respond to those requests is extended to July 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 6/24/2019. (Stouch, L.)
June 24, 2019 Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr regarding #10 MOTION for Extension of Time. (Stouch, L.)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Anita Fleming, Ella Godley, Dawn McCullough, Clara Meekins. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hairston, James)
June 13, 2019 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding #6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. (Stouch, L.)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 Notice filed by Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc. regarding #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing Acknowledgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acknowledgment of Filing of Notice of Removal) (Jenkins, Amy)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 Financial Disclosure Statement by Anita Fleming, Ella Godley, Dawn McCullough, Clara Meekins (Hairston, James)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by James E. Hairston, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Hairston, James)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc.. (Jenkins, Amy)
May 20, 2019 Notice to Counsel regarding: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Financial Disclosure Statement, #3 Notice of Appearance, #4 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) - All documents referenced in the certificate of service as being served on opposing party via CM/ECF have not been served through the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing system (CM/ECF) due to the fact that plaintiff's counsel has not made an appearance in the case that has been removed to Federal Court. (Rudd, D.)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel James E. Hairston, Jr. of Hairston Lane, P.A. at 434 Fayetteville Street, Suite 2350, Raleigh, NC 27601 via US Mail on May 20, 2019. (Rudd, D.)
May 20, 2019 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc. (Jenkins, Amy)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Amy Jenkins on behalf of Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc.. (Jenkins, Amy)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc. (Jenkins, Amy)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc. from Wake County Superior Court, case number 18-CVS-007031. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4951256), filed by Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Superior Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Supplement Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Jenkins, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCullough et al v. Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Fleming
Represented By: James E. Hairston, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ella Godley
Represented By: James E. Hairston, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn McCullough
Represented By: James E. Hairston, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Meekins
Represented By: James E. Hairston, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban Ministries Of Wake County, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?